Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1036267

EP1036267 - LOST MOTION VALVE ACTUATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  15.11.2002
Database last updated on 20.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip15.11.2002Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 02.01.2003  [2003/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Diesel Engine Retarders, Inc.
Suite 105, 501 Silverside Road
Wilmington, DE 19809 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/38]For all designated states
DIESEL ENGINE RETARDERS, INC.
Suite 105, 501 Silverside Road
Wilmington, DE 19809 / US
Inventor(s)01 / VORIH, Joseph, M.
1669 Mountain Road
West Suffield, CT 06093 / US
02 / EGAN, James, J.
400 Halladay Avenue, West
Suffield, CT 06078 / US
[2000/38]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/38]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date98957576.604.11.1998
[2000/38]
WO1998US23490
Priority number, dateUS19970064206P04.11.1997         Original published format: US 64206 P
US19970065815P14.11.1997         Original published format: US 65815 P
US19970066096P17.11.1997         Original published format: US 66096 P
[2000/38]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9923378
Date:14.05.1999
Language:EN
[1999/19]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1036267
Date:20.09.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.05.1999
[2000/38]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US14.05.1999
ClassificationInternational:F02D39/02
[2000/38]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE [2000/38]
TitleGerman:VENTILTRIEB MIT TOTGANG[2000/38]
English:LOST MOTION VALVE ACTUATION SYSTEM[2000/38]
French:SYSTEME DE COMMANDE DE SOUPAPES AVEC MOUVEMENT A VIDE[2000/38]
Entry into regional phase31.05.2000National basic fee paid 
31.05.2000Search fee paid 
31.05.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
31.05.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.06.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
31.05.2000Examination requested  [2000/38]
21.08.2000Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
01.06.2002Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/01]
23.07.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2003/01]
Fees paidRenewal fee
03.11.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.11.200104   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[Y]US4742806  (TART JR EARL D [US], et al);
 [Y]US4936273  (MYERS VAUGHN D [US]);
 [X]US5680841  (HU HAORAN [US]);
 [XE]US5839453  (HU HAORAN [US])