Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1028708

EP1028708 - TOPICAL COMPOSITIONS FOR PROSTAGLANDIN E1 DELIVERY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2000/34]TOPICAL COMPOSITIONS FOR PROSTAGLANDIN E 1? DELIVERY
[2009/23]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  26.11.2010
Database last updated on 19.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip20.05.2011Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY, GR
published on 22.06.2011  [2011/25]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Nexmed Holdings, Inc.
350 Corporate Blvd.
Robbinsville, NJ 08691 / US
[2000/34]
Inventor(s)01 / BUYUKTIMKIN, Servet
2313 Willow Creek
Lawrence, KS 66049 / US
02 / BUYUKTIMKIN, Nadir
2313 Willow Creek
Lawrence, KS 66049 / US
03 / YEAGER, James, L.
820 Warwick Road
Deerfield, IL 60015 / US
[2000/34]
Representative(s)Schnappauf, Georg , et al
ZSP Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Hansastraße 32
80686 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2006/10]Schnappauf, Georg , et al
Dr. Volker Vossius Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Geibelstrasse 6
81679 München / DE
Former [2000/34]Grund, Martin, Dr. , et al
Holbeinstrasse 5
81679 München / DE
Application number, filing date98957603.805.11.1998
[2000/34]
WO1998US23576
Priority number, dateUS1997096450905.11.1997         Original published format: US 964509
[2000/34]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9922714
Date:14.05.1999
Language:EN
[1999/19]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1028708
Date:23.08.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.05.1999
[2000/34]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1028708
Date:20.01.2010
Language:EN
[2010/03]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US14.05.1999
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.12.2005
ClassificationInternational:A61K9/06, A61K9/70, A61K31/557, A61K47/18, A61F13/00, A61L15/00, A61K47/10, A61K47/02, A61K47/32
[2006/03]
Former International [2000/34]A61K9/06, A61K9/70, A61K31/557, A61K47/18, A61F13/00, A61L15/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/34]
TitleGerman:TOPISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ZUR VERABREICHUNG VON PROSTAGLANDIN E1[2009/23]
English:TOPICAL COMPOSITIONS FOR PROSTAGLANDIN E1 DELIVERY[2009/23]
French:COMPOSITIONS TOPIQUES POUR L'ADMINISTRATION DE PROSTAGLANDINE E1[2009/23]
Former [2000/34]TOPISCHE MITTEL ZUR VERABREICHUNG VON PROSTAGLANDIN E 1
Former [2000/34]TOPICAL COMPOSITIONS FOR PROSTAGLANDIN E 1? DELIVERY
Former [2000/34]COMPOSITIONS TOPIQUES UTILES POUR L'ADMINISTRATION DE PROSTAGLANDINE E 1?
Entry into regional phase05.06.2000National basic fee paid 
05.06.2000Search fee paid 
05.06.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
05.06.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.05.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
05.06.2000Examination requested  [2000/34]
20.07.2000Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
06.10.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.02.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.05.2009Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.09.2009Fee for grant paid
11.09.2009Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)21.10.2010No opposition filed within time limit [2010/52]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.11.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
22.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
26.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
27.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
26.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
25.11.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
29.11.2006Renewal fee patent year 09
28.11.2007Renewal fee patent year 10
27.11.2008Renewal fee patent year 11
27.11.2009Renewal fee patent year 12
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY20.01.2010
FI20.01.2010
GR21.04.2010
PT20.05.2010
[2011/25]
Former [2010/44]FI20.01.2010
PT20.05.2010
Documents cited:Search[A]US5219885  (FROELICH JUERGEN [DE], et al) [A] 1-16 * column 1, line 65 - column 2, line 7 * * column 3, lines 26-38 * * column 4; example 2 *;
 [A]EP0302147  (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [A] 1-16 * page 4, lines 35-41 * * page 5, line 53 - page 7, line 9 * * page 8; example 2 * * claims 1-12 *;
 [DA]US5380760  (WENDEL HANNS [DE], et al) [DA] 1-16 * column 1, line 66 - column 2, line 11 * * column 3, lines 27-43 * * column 4, lines 47-52 * * claims 1,2 *;
 [A]US4594240  (KAWATA TERUSHIGE [JP], et al) [A] 1-16 * column 2, lines 3-6,37-50 * * column 3, lines 63-68 * * column 4, lines 35-39 * * column 5, lines 3-25 *;
 [A]US5082866  (WONG OOI [US], et al) [A] 1-16 * column 5, lines 55-60 * * column 6, line 49 - column 7, line 42 * * column 9, lines 48-68 * * column 10, line 62 - column 11, line 19 *
International search[Y]US4661524  (THOMSON MICHAEL J [GB], et al);
 [Y]US4865848  (CHENG YU-LING [US], et al);
 [Y]US4973468  (CHIANG CHIA-MING [US], et al);
 [Y]US4980378  (WONG OOI [US], et al)
by applicantUS4771004
    - Physician's Desk Reference,
    - The Merck Index, MERCK & CO.,
    - Martindale The Extra Pharmacopoeia, THE PHARMACEUTICAL PRESS,
    - Industrial Gums: Polysaccharides & Their Derivatives, ACADEMIC PRESS,
    - DAVIDSON R. L., Handbook of Water-Soluble Gums & Resins, MCGRAW-HILL, INC.,