Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1031098

EP1031098 - EFFICIENT CORRELATION OVER A SLIDING WINDOW [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.12.2006
Database last updated on 22.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip15.12.2006No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 17.01.2007  [2007/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ericsson Inc.
6300 Legacy Drive MS EVW 2-C-2
Plano, TX 75024 / US
[N/P]
Former [2006/06]For all designated states
Ericsson Inc.
6300 Legacy Drive, MS EVW 2-C-2
Plano, TX 75024 / US
Former [2004/02]For all designated states
Ericsson Inc.
6300 Legacy, MS EVW 2-C-2
Plano, TX 75024 / US
Former [2000/35]For all designated states
ERICSSON INC.
7001 Development Drive, P.O. Box 13969
Research Triangle Park, NC 27709 / US
Inventor(s)01 / DENT, Paul, W.
637 Eagle Point Road
Pittsboro, NC 27312 / US
02 / WANG, Eric
215 Cedarpost Drive
Cary, NC 27513 / US
[2000/35]
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastrasse 30
81925 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/35]HOFFMANN - EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Application number, filing date98957780.410.11.1998
[2000/35]
WO1998US23960
Priority number, dateUS1997096744411.11.1997         Original published format: US 967444
[2000/35]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9924916
Date:20.05.1999
Language:EN
[1999/20]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1031098
Date:30.08.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.05.1999
[2000/35]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1031098
Date:08.02.2006
Language:EN
[2006/06]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP20.05.1999
ClassificationInternational:G06F17/15, H04B1/707
[2000/35]
Designated contracting statesDE,   GB [2000/35]
TitleGerman:EFFIZIENTE KORRELATION MIT SCHIEBEFENSTER[2000/35]
English:EFFICIENT CORRELATION OVER A SLIDING WINDOW[2000/35]
French:CORRELATION EFFICACE SUR UNE FENETRE GLISSANTE[2000/35]
Entry into regional phase02.05.2000National basic fee paid 
02.05.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
02.05.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.06.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
22.11.1999Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
02.05.2000Examination requested  [2000/35]
18.02.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
21.08.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.07.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.12.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.12.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.04.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.06.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.10.2005Fee for grant paid
20.10.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)09.11.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2007/03]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.10.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
22.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
25.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
21.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
22.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
29.11.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
Cited inInternational search[A]EP0707385  (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE [JP]) [A] 1-24 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO9626578  (ERICSSON GE MOBILE INC [US]) [A] 1-24 * page 6, paragraph 1 *