Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1032704

EP1032704 - METHOD FOR UNBIASED MRNA AMPLIFICATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  12.11.2004
Database last updated on 17.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip12.11.2004Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 29.12.2004  [2004/53]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
INCYTE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
3174 Porter Drive
Palo Alto CA 94304 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/36]For all designated states
INCYTE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
3174 Porter Drive
Palo Alto, CA 94304 / US
Inventor(s)01 / WANG, Bruce
1123 Banyon Way
Pacifica, CA 94404 / US
02 / CHUNG, Alicia
1597 17th Avenue
San Francisco California 94122 / US
 [2001/13]
Former [2000/36]01 / WANG, Bruce
1123 Banyon Way
Pacifica, CA 94404 / US
02 / CHUNG, Alicia
259 Third Street 3
New York, NY 10010 / US
Representative(s)Wright, Simon Mark , et al
J A Kemp
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/45]Wright, Simon Mark , et al
J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5LX / GB
Former [2000/36]Wright, Simon Mark , et al
Kilburn & Strode 30 John Street
London WC1N 2DD / GB
Application number, filing date98957858.812.11.1998
[2000/36]
WO1998US24122
Priority number, dateUS1997097427319.11.1997         Original published format: US 974273
[2000/36]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9925873
Date:27.05.1999
Language:EN
[1999/21]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1032704
Date:06.09.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.05.1999
[2000/36]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP27.05.1999
ClassificationInternational:C12Q1/68
[2000/36]
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL [2000/36]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR GLEICHMÄSSIGEREN AMPLIFIZIERUNG VON MRNA[2000/36]
English:METHOD FOR UNBIASED MRNA AMPLIFICATION[2000/36]
French:TECHNIQUE D'AMPLIFICATION DE L'ARNm NON BIAISEE[2000/36]
Entry into regional phase22.05.2000National basic fee paid 
22.05.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
22.05.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.06.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
22.05.2000Examination requested  [2000/36]
07.06.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
27.03.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.02.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.06.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2004/53]
26.07.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2004/53]
Request for further processing for:27.03.2003Request for further processing filed
27.03.2003Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
08.04.2003Decision despatched
27.03.2002Request for further processing filed
27.03.2002Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
08.04.2003Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.11.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
22.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
25.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
21.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Cited inInternational search[DY]US5514545  (EBERWINE JAMES [US]) [DY] 1-3,5-7,9-11,13,15,17,20-22 * the whole document *;
 [DY]US5545522  (VAN GELDER RUSSELL N [US], et al) [DY] 1-3,5-7,9-11,13,15,17,20-22 * the whole document *;
 [Y]EP0682120  (UNIV LELAND STANFORD JUNIOR [US]) [Y] 1-3,5,9-12,15,18-22 * abstract *;
 [Y]US5614390  (MCCASLIN RICHARD B [US], et al) [Y] 1,7-9,14 * abstract * * column 10, line 12 - line 24 *;
 [A]EP0587298  (GEN PROBE INC [US]) [A] * the whole document *;
 [DY]  - EBERWINE J, "Amplification of mRNA populations using aRNA generated from immobilized oligo(dT)-T7 primed cDNA", BIOTECHNIQUES, (1996), vol. 20, pages 584 - 591, XP002096133 [DY] 1-22 * the whole document *
 [Y]  - DAVIS M J J ET AL., "Use of internal controls to increase quantitative capabilities of the ribonuclease protection assay", BIOTECHNIQUES, (1997), vol. 23, no. 2, pages 280 - 285, XP002096134 [Y] 1-3,9-11,13,15-17 * the whole document *
 [Y]  - OLD R W AND PRIMROSE S B, Principles of Gene Manipulation, OXFORD, GB, BLACKWELL SCIENTIFIC PUBLICATIONS, XP002096135 [Y] 1,4 * page 32, paragraph 2 - page 34, paragraph 1; figures 2.10,2.11 *
 [DA]  - EBERWINE J ET AL, "ANALYSIS OF GENE EXPRESSION IN SINGLE LIVE NEURONS", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF USA, (199204), vol. 89, pages 3010 - 3014, XP002912945 [DA] * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.89.7.3010