Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1032469

EP1032469 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR SEPARATION OF LIQUID AND SOLID PHASES FOR SOLID PHASE ORGANIC SYNTHESES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  19.01.2004
Database last updated on 17.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.07.2008Change - representativepublished on 13.08.2008  [2008/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
TREGA BIOSCIENCES, INC.
9880 Campus Point Drive
San Diego, CA 92121 / US
[2000/36]
Inventor(s)01 / LEBL, Michal
6161 Arnoldson Court
San Diego, CA 92122 / US
[2000/36]
Representative(s)Horner, Martin Grenville , et al
Marks & Clerk LLP
Aurora
120 Bothwell Street
Glasgow
G2 7JS / GB
[N/P]
Former [2008/33]Horner, Martin Grenville , et al
Marks & Clerk Scotland 19 Royal Exchange Square
Glasgow G1 3AE / GB
Former [2000/36]Horner, Martin Grenville , et al
Cruikshank & Fairweather 19 Royal Exchange Square
Glasgow G1 3AE, Scotland / GB
Application number, filing date98958035.217.11.1998
[2000/36]
WO1998US24519
Priority number, dateUS1997097409019.11.1997         Original published format: US 974090
[2000/36]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9925470
Date:27.05.1999
Language:EN
[1999/21]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1032469
Date:06.09.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.05.1999
[2000/36]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1032469
Date:12.03.2003
Language:EN
[2003/11]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP27.05.1999
ClassificationInternational:B01J19/00, B04B1/00
[2000/36]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/36]
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR TRENNUNG VON FLÜSSIGEN UND FESTEN PHASEN IN ORGANISCHEN FESTPHASENSYNTHESEN[2000/36]
English:APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR SEPARATION OF LIQUID AND SOLID PHASES FOR SOLID PHASE ORGANIC SYNTHESES[2000/36]
French:APPAREIL ET PROCEDE DE SEPARATION DES PHASES LIQUIDE ET SOLIDE POUR DES SYNTHESES ORGANIQUES EN PHASE SOLIDE[2000/36]
Entry into regional phase13.06.2000National basic fee paid 
13.06.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
13.06.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.06.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
13.06.2000Examination requested  [2000/36]
06.09.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
09.03.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.12.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.04.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.05.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
12.09.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
16.12.2002Fee for grant paid
16.12.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)15.12.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2004/10]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.11.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
14.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
23.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT12.03.2003
BE12.03.2003
CH12.03.2003
FI12.03.2003
GR12.03.2003
IT12.03.2003
LI12.03.2003
NL12.03.2003
DK12.06.2003
SE12.06.2003
PT16.06.2003
ES30.09.2003
CY17.11.2003
LU17.11.2003
MC30.11.2003
[2008/16]
Former [2005/02]AT12.03.2003
BE12.03.2003
CH12.03.2003
FI12.03.2003
GR12.03.2003
LI12.03.2003
NL12.03.2003
DK12.06.2003
SE12.06.2003
PT16.06.2003
ES30.09.2003
CY17.11.2003
LU17.11.2003
MC30.11.2003
Former [2004/39]AT12.03.2003
BE12.03.2003
CH12.03.2003
FI12.03.2003
GR12.03.2003
LI12.03.2003
NL12.03.2003
DK12.06.2003
SE12.06.2003
PT16.06.2003
ES30.09.2003
CY17.11.2003
LU17.11.2003
Former [2004/36]AT12.03.2003
BE12.03.2003
CH12.03.2003
FI12.03.2003
GR12.03.2003
LI12.03.2003
NL12.03.2003
DK12.06.2003
SE12.06.2003
PT16.06.2003
ES30.09.2003
CY17.11.2003
Former [2004/23]AT12.03.2003
BE12.03.2003
CH12.03.2003
FI12.03.2003
GR12.03.2003
LI12.03.2003
NL12.03.2003
DK12.06.2003
SE12.06.2003
PT16.06.2003
ES30.09.2003
Former [2004/10]AT12.03.2003
BE12.03.2003
CH12.03.2003
FI12.03.2003
GR12.03.2003
LI12.03.2003
NL12.03.2003
SE12.06.2003
PT16.06.2003
ES30.09.2003
Former [2004/04]AT12.03.2003
CH12.03.2003
FI12.03.2003
GR12.03.2003
LI12.03.2003
NL12.03.2003
SE12.06.2003
PT16.06.2003
ES30.09.2003
Former [2003/50]AT12.03.2003
CH12.03.2003
FI12.03.2003
GR12.03.2003
LI12.03.2003
NL12.03.2003
SE12.06.2003
PT16.06.2003
Former [2003/47]AT12.03.2003
CH12.03.2003
FI12.03.2003
GR12.03.2003
LI12.03.2003
NL12.03.2003
PT16.06.2003
Former [2003/46]CH12.03.2003
FI12.03.2003
GR12.03.2003
LI12.03.2003
NL12.03.2003
PT16.06.2003
Former [2003/43]CH12.03.2003
FI12.03.2003
LI12.03.2003
NL12.03.2003
PT16.06.2003
Former [2003/41]CH12.03.2003
FI12.03.2003
LI12.03.2003
NL12.03.2003
Former [2003/40]CH12.03.2003
LI12.03.2003
Cited inInternational search[X]US4412973  (GUIGAN JEAN [FR]) [X] 1,4 * column A * * column 2, line 30 - line 48 * * column 3, line 49 - column 4, line 13 * * figures 1,4; claim - *;
 [A]US3586484  (ANDERSON NORMAN G) [A] 1,4,8 * column W *;
 [A]WO9310455  (CIRRUS DIAGNOSTICS INC [US]) [A] 1,4-6,8 * abstract *;
 [A]EP0569115  (GEN ATOMICS [US]) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *;
 [A]FR2156519  (IMMUNO AG) [A] 1-4,7 * the whole document *;
 [A]  - MENOTTI RUVO ET AL., "Facile Manual Synthesis of Peptide Libraries", PROTEIN AND PEPTIDE LETTERS., SCHIPHOL NL, (1994), vol. 1, no. 3, pages 187 - 192, XP002098198 [A] 1,4,7 * abstract *