Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1036137

EP1036137 - PRODUCTION OF OLEFINS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  26.09.2003
Database last updated on 19.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip30.03.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): DK
published on 02.05.2007  [2007/18]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ATOFINA Research
Zone Industrielle C
7181 Seneffe (Feluy) / BE
[2001/33]
Former [2000/38]For all designated states
FINA RESEARCH S.A.
Zone Industrielle C
B-7181 Seneffe (Feluy) / BE
Inventor(s)01 / DATH, Jean-Pierre
Rue d'Ath 53
B-7970 Beloeil / BE
02 / DELORME, Luc
Avenue des Petits Champs 10
B-1410 Waterloo / BE
03 / GROOTJANS, Jacques-François
Neeryresteenweg 39
B-3061 Leefdaal / BE
04 / VANHAEREN, Xavier
Vieux Chemin de l'Helpe 63
B-1332 Genval / BE
05 / VERMEIREN, Walter
Winningstraat 4
B-3530 Houthalen / BE
[2000/38]
Application number, filing date98958127.707.12.1998
[2000/38]
WO1998BE00193
Priority number, dateEP1997012138805.12.1997         Original published format: EP 97121388
[2000/38]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9929807
Date:17.06.1999
Language:EN
[1999/24]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1036137
Date:20.09.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.06.1999
[2000/38]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1036137
Date:20.11.2002
Language:EN
[2002/47]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP17.06.1999
ClassificationInternational:C10G11/05
[2000/38]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/38]
Extension statesLT30.05.2000
LV30.05.2000
RO30.05.2000
SI30.05.2000
TitleGerman:HERSTELLUNG VON OLEFINEN[2000/38]
English:PRODUCTION OF OLEFINS[2000/38]
French:PRODUCTION D'OLEFINES[2000/38]
Entry into regional phase30.05.2000National basic fee paid 
30.05.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
30.05.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.06.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
30.05.2000Examination requested  [2000/38]
29.09.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
27.03.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.01.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
13.06.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.09.2002Fee for grant paid
13.09.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)21.08.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/46]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.09.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
21.12.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
30.07.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCH20.11.2002
FI20.11.2002
GR20.11.2002
LI20.11.2002
DK20.02.2003
PT20.02.2003
SE20.02.2003
[2007/18]
Former [2003/43]CH20.11.2002
FI20.11.2002
GR20.11.2002
LI20.11.2002
PT20.02.2003
SE20.02.2003
Former [2003/39]CH20.11.2002
GR20.11.2002
LI20.11.2002
PT20.02.2003
SE20.02.2003
Former [2003/29]GR20.11.2002
PT20.02.2003
SE20.02.2003
Former [2003/20]GR20.11.2002
SE20.02.2003
Former [2003/19]SE20.02.2003
Cited inInternational search[A]EP0109059  (MONTEDIPE SPA [IT]) [A] 1,2,4,11 * claims 1,2,5,8 * * page 3, line 13 - line 19 * * tables 1-4 *;
 [A]EP0534142  (CHEVRON RES & TECH [US]) [A] 1,2,4,6,7 * claims 1-3,19 * * page 3, line 43 - line 48 * * page 4, line 54 - line 55 *;
 [A]US5043307  (BOWES EMMERSON [US], et al) [A] 1,5 * claims 1,3 * * column 9, line 57 - line 65 *