Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0979354

EP0979354 - SIDE CANAL PUMP WITH A SIDE CANAL LOCATED IN THE SUCTION COVER IN ORDER TO AVOID IMPERFECT VORTEX STRUCTURES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  27.05.2005
Database last updated on 19.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip15.08.2008Change - representativepublished on 17.09.2008  [2008/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ROBERT BOSCH GMBH
Postfach 30 02 20
70442 Stuttgart / DE
[2000/07]
Inventor(s)01 / HUEBEL, Michael
Lorscher Weg 1
D-70839 Gerlingen / DE
02 / STROHL, Willi
Rieslingstrasse 13
D-71717 Beilstein / DE
[2000/07]
Representative(s)Hörschler, Wolfram Johannes , et al
Patentanwälte
Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler PartG mbB
Eastsite One
Seckenheimer Landstrasse 4
68163 Mannheim / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/38]Hörschler, Wolfram Johannes , et al
Isenbruck, Bösl, Hörschler, Wichmann, Huhn Patentanwälte Theodor-Heuss-Anlage 12
68165 Mannheim / DE
Former [2003/39]Hörschler, Wolfram Johannes , et al
Isenbruck, Bösl, Hörschler, Wichmann, Huhn, Patentanwälte Theodor-Heuss-Anlage 12
68165 Mannheim / DE
Application number, filing date98958154.123.09.1998
[2000/07]
WO1998DE02819
Priority number, dateDE1997105758023.12.1997         Original published format: DE 19757580
[2000/07]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9934117
Date:08.07.1999
Language:DE
[1999/27]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0979354
Date:16.02.2000
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.07.1999
[2000/07]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0979354
Date:21.07.2004
Language:DE
[2004/30]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP08.07.1999
ClassificationInternational:F04D5/00
[2000/07]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE [2000/07]
TitleGerman:SEITENKANALPUMPE MIT SEITENKANAL IM ANSAUGDECKEL ZUR VERMEIDUNG VERLUSTBEHAFTETER WIRBELSTRUKTUREN[2000/07]
English:SIDE CANAL PUMP WITH A SIDE CANAL LOCATED IN THE SUCTION COVER IN ORDER TO AVOID IMPERFECT VORTEX STRUCTURES[2000/07]
French:POMPE REGENERATIVE PRESENTANT UN CANAL LATERAL DANS LE COUVERCLE D'ASPIRATION POUR EVITER DES STRUCTURES TOURBILLONNAIRES A PERTES IMPORTANTES[2000/07]
Entry into regional phase23.09.1999National basic fee paid 
23.09.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
10.01.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.01.2000Examination requested  [2000/10]
11.07.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
08.01.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.02.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.04.2004Fee for grant paid
06.04.2004Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)22.04.2005No opposition filed within time limit [2005/28]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.10.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
01.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
30.09.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
30.09.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipGB21.07.2004
SE21.10.2004
[2005/45]
Former [2005/10]SE21.10.2004
Cited inInternational search[Y]US5336045  (KOYAMA HIDEKI [JP], et al) [Y] 1,2,4,7-15,18 * column 1, line 6 - line 8 * * column 3, line 63 - column 5, line 64 * * column 9, line 64 - column 10, line 66; figures 1,2,6-9 *;
 [Y]US5284417  (YU DEQUAN [US]) [Y] 1,2,4,7-15,18 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5551835  (YU DEQUAN [US], et al) [A] 1,2,4,6-14 * abstract * * column 5, line 7 - line 49; figure - *;
 [A]US4591311  (MATSUDA TAKESHI [JP], et al) [A] 1,2,4 * column 1, line 7 - line 11 * * column 2, line 20 - column 4, line 3; figure - *;
 [DA]DE4343078  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE])
 [A]  - TONN E, "ZUR BERECHNUNG VON PERIPHERALPUMPEN", KONSTRUKTION, (19920201), vol. 44, no. 2, pages 64 - 70, XP000306468
by applicantDE19504079
 DE4343078