Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1037530

EP1037530 - ribG [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  15.02.2002
Database last updated on 22.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip15.02.2002Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 03.04.2002  [2002/14]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORPORATION
One Franklin Plaza P.O. Box 7929 Philadelphia
Pennsylvania 19103 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/39]For all designated states
SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORPORATION
One Franklin Plaza P.O. Box 7929
Philadelphia Pennsylvania 19103 / US
Inventor(s)01 / PALMER, Leslie, M.
2820 Eagleville Road
Audubon, PA 19407 / US
02 / FEDON, Jason, C.
Apartment 2 106 Fairfield Lane
Strafford, PA 19087 / US
03 / WARREN, Richard, L.
825 Cathcart Road
Blue Bell, PA 19422 / US
04 / TRANI, Christopher, M.
50 Potter Court
Media, PA 19063 / US
05 / KNOWLES, David, J., C.
Ladywell House York Road
Boroughbridge North Yorkshire / GB
06 / BLACK, Michael, T.
47 Boulevard d'Angleterre
Le Vesinet 78110 / FR
07 / HODGSON, John, E.
260 Lapp Road
Malvern, PA 19355 / US
08 / NICHOLAS, Richard, O.
417 Franklin Court
Collegeville, PA 19424-2246 / US
09 / LONETTO, Michael, A.
474 School Lane
Wayne, PA 19087-5431 / US
10 / PRATT, Julie, M.
Via Alessandro Fleming, 2
I-37155 Verona / IT
11 / REICHARD, Raymond, W.
2091 Clover Mill Road
Quakertown, PA 18951 / US
12 / WARD, Judith, M.
Carmele Cottage 19 Cotmandene
Dorking Surrey / GB
13 / ROSENBERG, Martin
241 Mingo Road
Royersford, PA 19468 / US
14 / BURNHAM, Martin, K., R.
565 Forge Dale Road
Barto, PA 18432 / US
[2001/01]
Former [2000/51]01 / PALMER, Leslie, M.
2820 Eagleville Road
Audubon, PA 19407 / US
02 / FEDON, Jason, C.
Apartment 2 106 Fairfield Lane
Strafford, PA 19087 / US
03 / WARREN, Richard, L.
825 Cathcart Road
Blue Bell, PA 19422 / US
04 / TRANI, Christopher, M.
50 Potter Court
Media, PA 19063 / US
05 / KNOWLES, David, J., C.
Ladywell House York Road
Boroughbridge North Yorkshire / GB
06 / BLACK, Michael, T.
502 Milhouse Way
Chester Springs, PA 19425 / US
07 / HODGSON, John, E.
260 Lapp Road
Malvern, PA 19355 / US
08 / NICHOLAS, Richard, O.
417 Franklin Court
Collegeville, PA 19424-2246 / US
09 / LONETTO, Michael, A.
474 School Lane
Wayne, PA 19087-5431 / US
10 / PRATT, Julie, M.
Via Alessandro Fleming, 2
I-37155 Verona / IT
11 / REICHARD, Raymond, W.
2091 Clover Mill Road
Quakertown, PA 18951 / US
12 / WARD, Judith, M.
Carmele Cottage 19 Cotmandene
Dorking Surrey / GB
13 / ROSENBERG, Martin
241 Mingo Road
Royersford, PA 19468 / US
14 / BURNHAM, Martin, K., R.
565 Forge Dale Road
Barto, PA 18432 / US
Former [2000/44]01 / PALMER, Leslie, M.
2820 Eagleville Road
Audubon, PA 19407 / US
02 / FEDON, Jason, C.
Apartment 2 106 Fairfield Lane
Strafford, PA 19087 / US
03 / WARREN, Richard, L.
825 Cathcart Road
Blue Bell, PA 19422 / US
04 / TRANI, Christopher, M.
50 Potter Court
Media, PA 19063 / US
05 / KNOWLES, David, J., C.
Ladywell House York Road
Boroughbridge North Yorkshire / GB
06 / BLACK, Michael, T.
502 Milhouse Way
Chester Springs, PA 19425 / US
07 / HODGSON, John, E.
260 Lapp Road
Malvern, PA 19355 / US
08 / NICHOLAS, Richard, O.
355 Carmen Drive
Collegeville, PA 19426 / US
09 / LONETTO, Michael, A.
474 School Lane
Wayne, PA 19087-5431 / US
10 / PRATT, Julie, M.
Via Alessandro Fleming, 2
I-37155 Verona / IT
11 / REICHARD, Raymond, W.
2091 Clover Mill Road
Quakertown, PA 18951 / US
12 / WARD, Judith, M.
Carmele Cottage 19 Cotmandene
Dorking Surrey / GB
13 / ROSENBERG, Martin
241 Mingo Road
Royersford, PA 19468 / US
14 / BURNHAM, Martin, K., R.
565 Forge Dale Road
Barto, PA 18432 / US
Former [2000/39]01 / PALMER, Leslie, M.
2820 Eagleville Road
Audubon, PA 19407 / US
02 / FEDON, Jason, C.
Apartment 2 106 Fairfield Lane
Strafford, PA 19087 / US
03 / WARREN, Richard, L.
825 Cathcart Road
Blue Bell, PA 19422 / US
04 / TRANI, Christopher, M.
50 Potter Court
Media, PA 19063 / US
05 / KNOWLES, David, J., C.
Ladywell House York Road
Boroughbridge North Yorkshire / GB
06 / BLACK, Michael, T.
502 Milhouse Way
Chester Springs, PA 19425 / US
07 / HODGSON, John, E.
260 Lapp Road
Malvern, PA 19355 / US
08 / NICHOLAS, Richard, O.
355 Carmen Drive
Collegeville, PA 19426 / US
09 / LONETTO, Michael, A.
18 Victoria Circle
Collegeville, PA 19426 / US
10 / PRATT, Julie, M.
Via Alessandro Fleming, 2
I-37155 Verona / IT
11 / REICHARD, Raymond, W.
2091 Clover Mill Road
Quakertown, PA 18951 / US
12 / WARD, Judith, M.
Carmele Cottage 19 Cotmandene
Dorking Surrey / GB
13 / ROSENBERG, Martin
241 Mingo Road
Royersford, PA 19468 / US
14 / BURNHAM, Martin, K., R.
565 Forge Dale Road
Barto, PA 18432 / US
Representative(s)Mallalieu, Catherine Louise
D Young & Co LLP
120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/39]Mallalieu, Catherine Louise
D. Young & Co., 21 New Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1DA / GB
Application number, filing date98958676.323.11.1998
[2000/39]
WO1998US24857
Priority number, dateUS1997097845625.11.1997         Original published format: US 978456
[2000/39]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9926475
Date:03.06.1999
Language:EN
[1999/22]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1037530
Date:27.09.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.06.1999
[2000/39]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US03.06.1999
ClassificationInternational:A01N43/04, A01N63/00, A61K39/02, A61K39/395, A61K39/40, C07H21/04, C07K1/00, C07K16/00, C12N5/00, C12N15/00, C12P21/06, C12Q1/68, G01N33/53
[2000/39]
Designated contracting statesBE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL [2000/39]
TitleGerman:ribG[2000/39]
English:ribG[2000/39]
French:ribG[2000/39]
Entry into regional phase26.06.2000National basic fee paid 
26.06.2000Search fee paid 
26.06.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
26.06.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.06.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
26.06.2000Examination requested  [2000/39]
05.02.2002Application withdrawn by applicant  [2002/14]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.11.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
30.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[X]US5175101  (GOETZ FRIEDRICH [DE], et al);
 [X]US4978332  (LUCK EDWARD E [US], et al);
 [X]US4122158  (SCHMITT EDWARD EMIL);
 [X]WO9428139  (MASSACHUSETTS INST TECHNOLOGY [US], et al);
 [A]US5561054  (KRON MICHAEL A [US], et al)