Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0993411

EP0993411 - TRANSPORT SYSTEM FOR BAGGAGE TROLLEYS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  15.11.2002
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip15.11.2002Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 02.01.2003  [2003/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SYSTEM SCHULTHEIS AG
Brauereiweg 8
8640 Rapperswil / CH
[N/P]
Former [2000/16]For all designated states
System Schultheis AG
Brauereiweg 8
8640 Rapperswil / CH
Inventor(s)01 / GREUB, Bruno, A.
Ob. Matt 29
CH-8713 Uerikon / CH
[2000/16]
Representative(s)Troesch Scheidegger Werner AG
Patentanwälte
Postfach
8032 Zürich / CH
[N/P]
Former [2000/16]Troesch Scheidegger Werner AG
Patentanwälte, Siewerdtstrasse 95, Postfach
8050 Zürich / CH
Application number, filing date98958764.716.12.1998
[2000/16]
WO1998CH00541
Priority number, dateCH1998000047927.02.1998         Original published format: CH 47998
[2000/16]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9943581
Date:02.09.1999
Language:DE
[1999/35]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0993411
Date:19.04.2000
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.09.1999
[2000/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP02.09.1999
ClassificationInternational:B65G37/00, B65G47/57
[2000/16]
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   LI [2000/16]
TitleGerman:TRANSPORTSYSTEM FÜR GEPÄCKWAGEN[2000/16]
English:TRANSPORT SYSTEM FOR BAGGAGE TROLLEYS[2000/16]
French:SYSTEME DE TRANSPORT POUR CHARIOTS A BAGAGES[2000/16]
Entry into regional phase07.06.1999National basic fee paid 
07.06.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
07.06.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.06.1999Examination requested  [2000/16]
14.02.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
13.03.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.06.2002Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/01]
30.07.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2003/01]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.11.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
12.01.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
01.01.200204   M06   Fee paid on   12.01.2002
Cited inInternational search[A]EP0597285  (EXPRESSO DEUTSCHLAND [DE]);
 [A]EP0286986  (SYSTEM SCHULTHEIS AG [CH]);
 [A]FR2533198  (DEMAG AG MANNESMANN [FR]);
 [A]EP0737634  (RSL LOGISTIK GMBH & CO [DE]);
 [A]FR2345374  (MOLINS LTD [GB]);
 [A]WO9111576  (JOCHUM HERBERT M [DE])