Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1032658

EP1032658 - PECTATE LYASES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2000/36]NOVEL PECTATE LYASES
[2000/37]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.05.2013
Database last updated on 17.11.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip18.10.2013Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IE
published on 20.11.2013  [2013/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Novozymes A/S
Krogsho̸jvej 36
2880 Bagsvaerd / DK
[2012/26]
Former [2001/04]For all designated states
Novozymes A/S
Krogshoejvej 36
2880 Bagsvaerd / DK
Former [2000/36]For all designated states
NOVO NORDISK A/S
Novo Allé
2880 Bagsvaerd / DK
Inventor(s)01 / ANDERSEN, Lene, Nonboe
Laksevej 11
DK-3450 Alleroed / DK
02 / SCHÜLEIN, Martin
Wiedeweltsgade 51
DK-2100 Copenhagen / DK
03 / LANGE, Niels Erik Krebs
Apt. 5, 7212 Stoneclliff Drive
Raleigh, NC 27615 / US
04 / BJOERNVAD, Mads, Eskelund
Dr. Abildgaards Allé 8, 3th
DK-1955 Frederiksberg / DK
05 / MOELLER, Soeren
Ved Furesoen 9
DK-2840 Holte / DK
06 / GLAD, Sanne O. Schroeder
Viggo Barfoeds Allé 59
DK-2750 Ballerup / DK
07 / KAUPPINEN, Markus, Sakari
Norskekrogen 12
2765 Smorum / DK
08 / SCHNORR, Kirk
Soelleroedgaardsvej 38
DK-2840 Holte / DK
09 / KONGSBAEK, Lars
Vaengestien 2A
DK-2840 Holte / DK
[2000/45]
Former [2000/36]01 / ANDERSEN, Lene, Nonboe
Laksevej 11
DK-3450 Alleroed / DK
02 / SCHÜLEIN, Martin
Wiedeweltsgade 51
DK-2100 Copenhagen / DK
03 / LANGE, Niels Erik Krebs
Apt. 5, 7212 Stoneclliff Drive
Raleigh, NC 27615 / US
04 / BJOERNVAD, Mads, Eskelund
Dr. Abildgaards Allé 8, 3th
DK-1955 Frederiksberg / DK
05 / MOELLER, Soeren
Ved Furesoen 9
DK-2840 Holte / DK
06 / GLAD, Sanne O. Schroeder
Viggo Barfoeds Allé 59
DK-2750 Ballerup / DK
07 / KAUPPINEN, Markus, Sakari
Egegade 10,5
DK-2200 Copenhagen N / DK
08 / SCHNORR, Kirk
Noerrebrogade 44A, 1. tv.
DK-2200 Copenhagen N / DK
09 / KONGSBAEK, Lars
Vaengestien 2A
DK-2840 Holte / DK
Representative(s)(deleted)
...
[2001/04]
Former [2000/36]Joersboe, Anne-Marie Charlotte Henszelman , et al
Novo Nordisk A/S, Corporate Patents, Novo Allé 1
2880 Bagsvaerd / DK
Application number, filing date98958820.724.11.1998
[2000/36]
WO1998DK00515
Priority number, dateDK1997000134324.11.1997         Original published format: DK 134397
DK1997000134424.11.1997         Original published format: DK 134497
US1998007368406.05.1998         Original published format: US 73684
US1998018421702.11.1998         Original published format: US 184217
[2000/36]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9927084
Date:03.06.1999
Language:EN
[1999/22]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1032658
Date:06.09.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.06.1999
[2000/36]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1032658
Date:27.06.2012
Language:EN
[2012/26]
Search report(s)International search reportSE03.06.1999
ClassificationInternational:C12N9/88, C12N9/40, D06L3/11
[2011/37]
Former International [2000/36]C12N9/88, // C12N9:88, C12R1:10, C11D3:386
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/36]
TitleGerman:PECTATLYASE[2000/37]
English:PECTATE LYASES[2000/37]
French:LYASES DE PECTATE[2000/37]
Former [2000/36]Pectatlyase
Former [2000/36]NOVEL PECTATE LYASES
Former [2000/36]NOUVELLES LYASES DE PECTATE
Biological materialThis application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details
Entry into regional phase26.06.2000National basic fee paid 
26.06.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
26.06.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure05.06.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
26.06.2000Examination requested  [2000/36]
05.02.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.06.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.12.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.04.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.03.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.07.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.01.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
20.07.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.10.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
08.12.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.01.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.04.2012Fee for grant paid
13.04.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  05.02.2004
Opposition(s)28.03.2013No opposition filed within time limit [2013/23]
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.11.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
30.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
02.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
01.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
30.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
30.11.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
30.11.2006Renewal fee patent year 09
30.11.2007Renewal fee patent year 10
01.12.2008Renewal fee patent year 11
30.11.2009Renewal fee patent year 12
30.11.2010Renewal fee patent year 13
30.11.2011Renewal fee patent year 14
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT27.06.2012
DK27.06.2012
SE27.06.2012
GR28.09.2012
ES08.10.2012
PT29.10.2012
IE24.11.2012
CH30.11.2012
LI30.11.2012
[2013/47]
Former [2013/33]AT27.06.2012
DK27.06.2012
SE27.06.2012
GR28.09.2012
ES08.10.2012
PT29.10.2012
CH30.11.2012
LI30.11.2012
Former [2013/22]AT27.06.2012
DK27.06.2012
SE27.06.2012
GR28.09.2012
ES08.10.2012
PT29.10.2012
Former [2013/21]AT27.06.2012
DK27.06.2012
SE27.06.2012
GR28.09.2012
PT29.10.2012
Former [2013/13]AT27.06.2012
SE27.06.2012
GR28.09.2012
PT29.10.2012
Former [2013/07]AT27.06.2012
SE27.06.2012
GR28.09.2012
Former [2012/50]SE27.06.2012
GR28.09.2012
Former [2012/48]SE27.06.2012
Cited inInternational search[XP]EP0870834  (KAO CORP [JP]);
 [X]JP02200191  ;
 [A]JP56068393  ;
 [A]JP63146790
 [X]  - FILE WPI, Derwent Accession No. 90-285860, OJI PAPER CO., "Protein and Region Relating to its Expression and Secretion - Where DNA Sequence is Used to Increase Prodn. Yield of Pectic Acid Lyase by Microorganism"; & JP,A,02 200 191 (08-08-90) DW9038.,
 [X]  - AGRIC. BIOL. CHEM., Volume 55, No. 1, 1991, YOSHIMITSU MIYAZAKI, "Purification and Characterization of Endo-Pectate Lyase from Bacillus Macerans", pages 25-30.,
 [X]  - STN INTERNATIONAL, File CA, CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Volume 118, No. 25, 21 June 1993, (Columbus, Ohio, US), HAN HYE JEONG et al., "Characterization of Pectate Lyase from Alkalitorerant Bacillus sp. YA-14: Its Action Pattern and Active Center", Abstract No. 250320; & J. MICROBIOL. BIOTECHNOL., (1992), 2(4), 260-7.,
 [A]  - FILE WPI, Derwent Accession No. 81-54142D, AGENCY OF IND SCI AND TECHNOLOGY, "Pectate-Lyase Prepn. - Using Basophilic Bacillus Strain"; & JP,A,56 068 393 (09-06-81) DW8130.,
 [A]  - FILE WPI, Derwent Accession No. 88-209811, HOHNEN OIL KK, "Pectic Acid Lyase Mfr. - by Cloning Pectic Acid Lyase Gene Using E. Coli by Recombinant Deoxyribonucleic Acid Technique, Culturing E. Coli and Sepg. the Lyase"; & JP,A,63 146 790 (18-06-88) DW8830.,
 [A]  - CANADIAN JOURNAL OF MICROBIOLOGY, Volume 24, 1979, CATHERINE T. KELLY et al., "Production and Properties of Polygalacturonate Lyase by an Alkalophilic Microorganism Bacillus sp. RK9", pages 1164-1172.,
 [A]  - EMBL, Database GenBank/DDBJ, Accession No. L41673, ID PFPELYB, LIAO C.H. et al., "Cloning of E Pectate Lyase Gene from Xanthomonas Campestris pv. Malvacearum and Comparison of Its Sequence Relationship with Pel Genes of Soft-Rot Erwinia and Pseudomonas"; & MEDLINE, 96143678, 19 Feb. 1996.,