EP1048192 - HOUSING FOR ACCOMMODATING ELECTRONIC ASSEMBLY GROUPS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.09.2006 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.09.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.10.2006 [2006/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rothschild, Philon Rheinstrasse 27 64283 Darmstadt / DE | [2000/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2000/44] | Representative(s) | Helber, Friedrich Zenz, Helber, Hosbach & Partner Patentanwälte Scheuergasse 24 64673 Zwingenberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/44] | Helber, Friedrich G., Dipl.-Ing. Zenz, Helber & Hosbach Patentanwälte Scheuergasse 24 64673 Zwingenberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 98958855.3 | 21.10.1998 | [2000/44] | WO1998EP06669 | Priority number, date | DE19971047210 | 25.10.1997 Original published format: DE 19747210 | DE19971053342 | 02.12.1997 Original published format: DE 19753342 | DE19981012479 | 21.03.1998 Original published format: DE 19812479 | [2000/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9922554 | Date: | 06.05.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/18] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1048192 | Date: | 02.11.2000 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.05.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.07.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H05K7/14, G11B33/08 | [2000/44] | CPC: |
G11B33/128 (EP);
G11B33/08 (EP);
G11B33/14 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, ES, FI, FR, GB, IE, IT, NL, SE [2000/44] | Title | German: | GEHÄUSE ZUR AUFNAHME ELEKTRONISCHER BAUGRUPPEN | [2000/44] | English: | HOUSING FOR ACCOMMODATING ELECTRONIC ASSEMBLY GROUPS | [2000/44] | French: | BOITIER POUR LOGER DES MODULES ELECTRONIQUES | [2000/44] | Entry into regional phase | 13.04.2000 | National basic fee paid | 13.04.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.04.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.05.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 13.04.2000 | Examination requested [2000/44] | 03.05.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/42] | 02.06.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2006/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.10.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2004 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   25.04.2005 | 31.10.2005 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5510954 (WYLER GREGORY T) [A] 1-22 * column W *; | [A]US4896777 (LEWIS JEFFREY M) [A] 1-22 * column W *; | [A]US5510955 (TAESANG KIM) [A] 1-22 * column W *; | [A]US4713714 (GATTI JOHN E ET AL) [A] 23-31 * column W *; | [A]US5209356 (CHAFFEE THOMAS M) [A] 23-31 * column W *; | [A]WO9324932 (ANEMBO LTD ;SCHURMANN CHRISTOPH (IE); CUSACK MICHAEL (IE); NADLER) [A] 32-40 * column W *; | [A]US4642715 (ENDE DON S) [A] 32-40 * column W * |