Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1035944

EP1035944 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR CORRECTING ROTATING FAULTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2000/38]DEVICE AND METHOD FOR CORRECTING RADIAL RUN-OUTS
[2001/38]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  27.12.2002
Database last updated on 24.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip14.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 16.04.2008  [2008/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Kaspar Walter GmbH & CO. KG Maschinenfabrik
Aidenbachstrasse 44a
81379 München / DE
[2000/38]
Inventor(s)01 / ETTELBRÜCK, Rüdiger
Saturnstrasse 43
D-85609 Aschheim / DE
[2000/38]
Representative(s)Müller Hoffmann & Partner
Patentanwälte mbB
St.-Martin-Strasse 58
81541 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/38]MÜLLER & HOFFMANN Patentanwälte
Innere Wiener Strasse 17
81667 München / DE
Application number, filing date98958926.227.11.1998
[2000/38]
WO1998EP07688
Priority number, dateDE199715342602.12.1997         Original published format: DE 19753426
[2000/38]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9928080
Date:10.06.1999
Language:DE
[1999/23]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1035944
Date:20.09.2000
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.06.1999
[2000/38]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1035944
Date:13.02.2002
Language:DE
[2002/07]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP10.06.1999
ClassificationInternational:B23Q3/18
[2000/38]
Designated contracting statesAT,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL [2000/38]
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM KORRIGIEREN VON RUNDLAUFFEHLERN[2000/38]
English:DEVICE AND METHOD FOR CORRECTING ROTATING FAULTS[2001/38]
French:DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDE POUR LA CORRECTION DE FAUX-RONDS[2000/38]
Former [2000/38]DEVICE AND METHOD FOR CORRECTING RADIAL RUN-OUTS
Entry into regional phase24.03.2000National basic fee paid 
24.03.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
24.03.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure07.05.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
24.03.2000Examination requested  [2000/38]
08.03.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
13.07.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
07.08.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.11.2001Fee for grant paid
06.11.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)14.11.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2003/06]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.11.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
27.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipFR13.02.2002
GB13.02.2002
IT13.02.2002
NL13.02.2002
ES29.08.2002
[2008/16]
Former [2006/14]FR13.02.2002
GB13.02.2002
NL13.02.2002
ES29.08.2002
Former [2004/04]GB13.02.2002
NL13.02.2002
ES29.08.2002
Former [2003/09]GB13.02.2002
NL13.02.2002
Former [2003/01]GB13.02.2002
Cited inInternational search[XY]JPH03111148  ;
 [Y]EP0350799  (BRYANT GRINDER CORP [US]) [Y] 2,8 * the whole document *;
 [A]JPH09225767  ;
 [A]JPS61152353  ;
 [A]EP0324222  (BRYANT GRINDER CORP [US]) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *;
 [A]DD146266  (HAHN HARTMUT, et al)
 [XY]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19910802), vol. 15, no. 303, Database accession no. (M - 1142), [X] 1,3,4,7 * abstract * [Y] 2,8
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980130), vol. 98, no. 1, [A] 1-8 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19861128), vol. 10, no. 353, Database accession no. (M - 539), [A] 1-8 * abstract *