Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1036332

EP1036332 - MULTIPLE ASSAY METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  19.05.2006
Database last updated on 15.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip04.07.2008Change - representativepublished on 06.08.2008  [2008/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Amersham Biosciences UK Limited
Amersham Laboratories, White Lion Road Amersham
Buckinghamshire HP7 9LL / GB
[N/P]
Former [2004/02]For all designated states
Amersham Biosciences UK Limited
Amersham Laboratories, White Lion Road
Amersham, Buckinghamshire HP7 9LL / GB
Former [2000/38]For all designated states
Amersham Pharmacia Biotech UK Limited
Amersham Place
Little Chalfont, Buckinghamshire HP7 9NA / GB
Inventor(s)01 / THOMAS, Nicholas
12 Mapletree Close, Radyr
Cardiff, South Glamorgan CF4 8RU / GB
[2000/38]
Representative(s)Rollins, Anthony John
GE Healthcare Limited
Amersham Place
Little Chalfont
Buckinghamshire HP7 9NA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2008/32]Rollins, Anthony John
GE Healthcare Limited Amersham Place Little Chalfont
Buckinghamshire HP7 9NA / GB
Former [2000/38]Rollins, Anthony John
Group Patents, Nycomed Amersham plc, White Lion Road
Amersham, Buckinghamshire HP7 9LL / GB
Application number, filing date98959060.903.12.1998
[2000/38]
WO1998GB03727
Priority number, dateEP1997030978404.12.1997         Original published format: EP 97309784
[2000/38]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9964867
Date:16.12.1999
Language:EN
[1999/50]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1036332
Date:20.09.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.12.1999
[2000/38]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1036332
Date:13.07.2005
Language:EN
[2005/28]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP16.12.1999
ClassificationInternational:G01N33/58, C12Q1/00, G01N33/543
[2000/38]
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [2000/38]
TitleGerman:MEHRFACHES TESTVERFAHREN[2000/38]
English:MULTIPLE ASSAY METHOD[2000/38]
French:PROCEDE POUR DOSAGES MULTIPLES[2000/38]
Entry into regional phase04.07.2000National basic fee paid 
04.07.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
04.07.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure12.06.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
04.07.2000Examination requested  [2000/38]
30.06.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.10.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.05.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
03.09.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.01.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.05.2005Fee for grant paid
12.05.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)18.04.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/25]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.02.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
13.12.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
12.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
12.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
23.12.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.200003   M06   Fee paid on   28.02.2001
Lapses during opposition  TooltipES13.07.2005
IT13.07.2005
NL13.07.2005
SE13.10.2005
[2008/16]
Former [2007/18]ES13.07.2005
NL13.07.2005
SE13.10.2005
Former [2006/14]NL13.07.2005
SE13.10.2005
Former [2006/13]SE13.10.2005
Cited inInternational search[YX]JPH0627112  ;
 [YX]WO9302360  (TRANSMED BIOTECH INC [US]) [Y] 1-10 * claim 10 * [X] 11;
 [YX]WO9306121  (AFFYMAX TECH NV [NL]) [Y] 1-10 * figures 2,9 * [X] 11;
 [YX]WO9532425  (SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORP [US], et al) [Y] 1-10 * page 22 - page 27 * [X] 11;
 [YX]WO9714028  (LUMINEX CORP [US], et al) [Y] 1-10 * page 7, line 1 - page 8, line 23 * * figures 16A-C * [X] 11;
 [YDX]US5641634  (MANDECKI WLODEK [US]) [YD] 1-10 * example 3 * [X] 11;
 [A]WO9513538  (OPERON TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *
 [YX]  - DATABASE WPI, 1, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 94, no. 10, Database accession no. 94-077445, XP002102174 & JPH0627112 A 19940204 (NITTO DENKO CORP.) [Y] 1-10 * abstract * [X] 11