Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1042277

EP1042277 - NAPHTHALENE DERIVATIVES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  27.02.2004
Database last updated on 18.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip29.08.2008Change - representativepublished on 01.10.2008  [2008/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
FUJISAWA PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD.
4-7, Doshomachi 3-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi
Osaka 541-8514 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2003/17]For all designated states
FUJISAWA PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD.
4-7, Doshomachi 3-chome Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi Osaka 541-8514 / JP
Former [2000/41]For all designated states
FUJISAWA PHARMACEUTICAL CO., LTD.
4-7, Doshomachi 3-chome Chuo-ku
Osaka-shi Osaka 541-8514 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / HATTORI, Kouji
1-7-1-915, Sumiregaoka
Takarazuka-shi Hyogo 665-0847 / JP
02 / ITANI, Hiromichi
3-34-7, Shirogane Inagawa-cho
Kawabe-gun Hyogo 666-0257 / JP
03 / TANAKA, Akira
9-10-302, Nakano-cho
Takarazuka-shi Hyogo 665-0056 / JP
04 / SHIRAGA, Toshifumi
1-4-14-406, Hattori Yutakamachi
Toyonaka-shi Osaka 561-0859 / JP
[2000/41]
Representative(s)Gille Hrabal
Brucknerstrasse 20
40593 Düsseldorf / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/40]Gille Hrabal Struck Neidlein Prop Roos
Patentanwälte Brucknerstrasse 20
40593 Düsseldorf / DE
Former [2000/41]Gille Hrabal Struck Neidlein Prop Roos
Patentanwälte, Brucknerstrasse 20
40593 Düsseldorf / DE
Application number, filing date98959166.411.12.1998
[2000/41]
WO1998JP05603
Priority number, dateAU1997PP0109022.12.1997         Original published format: AU PP109097
[2000/41]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9932435
Date:01.07.1999
Language:EN
[1999/26]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1042277
Date:11.10.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.07.1999
[2000/41]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1042277
Date:23.04.2003
Language:EN
[2003/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP01.07.1999
ClassificationInternational:C07C271/28, A61K31/27
[2000/41]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/41]
TitleGerman:NAPHTHALIN DERIVATE[2000/41]
English:NAPHTHALENE DERIVATIVES[2000/41]
French:DERIVES DE NAPHTALENE[2000/41]
Entry into regional phase09.06.2000National basic fee paid 
09.06.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
09.06.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.06.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
09.06.2000Examination requested  [2000/41]
17.12.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.03.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.06.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.06.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.11.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.02.2003Fee for grant paid
14.02.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)26.01.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.12.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
13.12.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
12.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT23.04.2003
BE23.04.2003
CH23.04.2003
FI23.04.2003
LI23.04.2003
NL23.04.2003
DK23.07.2003
GR23.07.2003
PT23.07.2003
SE23.07.2003
IE11.12.2003
LU11.12.2003
[2005/23]
Former [2005/03]AT23.04.2003
BE23.04.2003
CH23.04.2003
FI23.04.2003
LI23.04.2003
NL23.04.2003
DK23.07.2003
GR23.07.2003
PT23.07.2003
SE23.07.2003
IE11.12.2003
Former [2004/28]AT23.04.2003
BE23.04.2003
CH23.04.2003
FI23.04.2003
LI23.04.2003
NL23.04.2003
DK23.07.2003
GR23.07.2003
PT23.07.2003
SE23.07.2003
Former [2004/23]AT23.04.2003
CH23.04.2003
FI23.04.2003
LI23.04.2003
NL23.04.2003
DK23.07.2003
GR23.07.2003
PT23.07.2003
SE23.07.2003
Former [2004/05]AT23.04.2003
CH23.04.2003
FI23.04.2003
LI23.04.2003
NL23.04.2003
GR23.07.2003
PT23.07.2003
SE23.07.2003
Former [2004/03]AT23.04.2003
CH23.04.2003
LI23.04.2003
NL23.04.2003
GR23.07.2003
PT23.07.2003
SE23.07.2003
Former [2004/02]CH23.04.2003
LI23.04.2003
NL23.04.2003
GR23.07.2003
PT23.07.2003
SE23.07.2003
Former [2003/41]SE23.07.2003
Cited inInternational search[DX]WO9524393  (FUJISAWA PHARMACEUTICAL CO [JP], et al) [DX] 1-10 * examples 2-16,21-25; claims 1,4,8 *