Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0961062

EP0961062 - PIEZOELECTRIC VALVE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.09.2011
Database last updated on 15.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip10.02.2012Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): GB
published on 14.03.2012  [2012/11]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SMC Kabushiki Kaisha
16-4, Shimbashi 1-chome Minato-ku
Tokyo 105-8659 / JP
[2010/44]
Former [1999/48]For all designated states
SMC Kabushiki Kaisha
16-4, Shinbashi 1-chome
Minato-ku, Tokyo 105-8659 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / MIYAZOE, Shinji SMC Kabushiki Kaisha
Tsukuba Gijutsu Ctr 2-2 Kinunodai 4-ch. Yawaramura
Tsukuba-gun Ibaraki-ken 300-2493 / JP
02 / ISHIKAWA, Makoto SMC Kabushiki Kaisha
Tsukuba Gijutsu Ctr 2-2 Kinunodai 4-ch. Yawaramura
Tsukuba-gun Ibaraki-ken 300-2493 / JP
[2000/15]
Former [1999/48]01 / MIYAZOE, Shinji SMC Kabushiki Kaisha
Tsukuba Gijutsu Ctr 2-2 Kinunodai 4-ch. Yawaramura
Tsukuba-gun Ibaraki-ken 300-2439 / JP
02 / ISHIKAWA, Makoto SMC Kabushiki Kaisha
Tsukuba Gijutsu Ctr 2-2 Kinunodai 4-ch. Yawaramura
Tsukuba-gun Ibaraki-ken 300-2439 / JP
Representative(s)Keil & Schaafhausen Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB
Friedrichstraße 2-6
60323 Frankfurt am Main / DE
[N/P]
Former [1999/48]KEIL & SCHAAFHAUSEN
Patentanwälte, Cronstettenstrasse 66
60322 Frankfurt am Main / DE
Application number, filing date98959183.911.12.1998
[1999/48]
WO1998JP05623
Priority number, dateJP1997034334612.12.1997         Original published format: JP 34334697
JP1998000989721.01.1998         Original published format: JP 989798
[1999/48]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9931420
Date:24.06.1999
Language:EN
[1999/25]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0961062
Date:01.12.1999
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.06.1999
[1999/48]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0961062
Date:03.11.2010
Language:EN
[2010/44]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP24.06.1999
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.11.2005
ClassificationInternational:F16K31/02, F16K31/00
[2006/01]
Former International [1999/48]F16K31/02, F16K7/14
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [1999/48]
TitleGerman:PIEZOELEKTRISCHES VENTIL[1999/48]
English:PIEZOELECTRIC VALVE[1999/48]
French:SOUPAPE PIEZO-ELECTRIQUE[1999/48]
Entry into regional phase05.08.1999Translation filed 
05.08.1999National basic fee paid 
05.08.1999Search fee paid 
05.08.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
05.08.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure05.08.1999Examination requested  [1999/48]
13.07.2004Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
05.02.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
15.08.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.03.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.07.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.05.2010Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.09.2010Fee for grant paid
21.09.2010Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP04016708.2  / EP1510741
Opposition(s)04.08.2011No opposition filed within time limit [2011/41]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.12.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
20.12.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
17.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
18.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
27.12.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
22.12.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
27.12.2006Renewal fee patent year 09
19.12.2007Renewal fee patent year 10
27.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 11
18.12.2009Renewal fee patent year 12
Lapses during opposition  TooltipIT03.11.2010
FR03.01.2011
GB03.02.2011
DE01.07.2011
[2012/11]
Former [2012/03]IT03.11.2010
FR03.01.2011
DE01.07.2011
Former [2011/51]FR03.01.2011
DE01.07.2011
Former [2011/47]FR03.01.2011
Documents cited:Search[XD]WO9617192  (SORTEX LIMITED) [XD] 14,17-19 * figures 4,6 *;
 [X]JPS5371324  (ARUBAATO FUREDERITSUKU HANSEN) [X] 14,17-19 * figures 7-9 *;
 [Y]JPH03223580  ;
 [Y]JPH0979408
 [Y]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19911224), vol. 015, no. 509, Database accession no. (M - 1195), & JP03223580 A 19911002 (MITSUBISHI KASEI CORP) [Y] 14-19 * abstract *
 [Y]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19970731), vol. 1997, no. 07, & JP09079408 A 19970325 (SAMII:KK) [Y] 14-19 * abstract *
International search[Y]JPH03223580  ;
 [Y]WO9617192  ;
 [Y]JPS62224780