Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0982787

EP0982787 - NON-AQUEOUS ELECTROLYTE SECONDARY CELL, NEGATIVE ELECTRODE THEREFOR, AND METHOD OF PRODUCING NEGATIVE ELECTRODE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  28.09.2012
Database last updated on 20.02.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip28.09.2012No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 31.10.2012  [2012/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Panasonic Corporation
1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi
Osaka 571-8501 / JP
[2008/47]
Former [2000/09]For all designated states
MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD.
1006, Ohaza Kadoma
Kadoma-shi, Osaka 571-8501 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / GOTO, Shusaku
1-16-22-329, Kikusuidori
Moriguchi-shi Osaka 570-0032 / JP
02 / INOUE, Kaoru
22-24-302, Shinbashi-cho
Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-0048 / JP
03 / TAKAHASHI, Yui
6-3-25-505, Shinmori
Asahi-ku
Osaka-shi Osaka 535-0022 / JP
04 / SUGIMOTO, Toyoji
3-8-1, Sawada
Fujiidera-shi Osaka 583-0011 / JP
 [2011/47]
Former [2000/09]01 / GOTO, Shusaku
1-16-22-329, Kikusuidori
Moriguchi-shi Osaka 570-0032 / JP
02 / INOUE, Kaoru
22-24-302, Shinbashi-cho
Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-0048 / JP
03 / TAKAHASHI, Yui
6-3-25-505, Shinmori Asahi-ku
Osaka-shi Osaka 535-0022 / JP
04 / SUGIMOTO, Toyoji
3-8-1, Sawada
Fujiidera-shi Osaka 583-0011 / JP
Representative(s)Kügele, Bernhard , et al
Novagraaf International SA
Chemin de l'Echo 3
1213 Onex / CH
[N/P]
Former [2011/47]Kügele, Bernhard , et al
Novagraaf International SA Chemin de l'Echo 3
1213 Onex / CH
Former [2000/09]Kügele, Bernhard , et al
NOVAPAT INTERNATIONAL SA, 9, Rue du Valais
1202 Genève / CH
Application number, filing date98959207.615.12.1998
[2000/09]
WO1998JP05653
Priority number, dateJP1997034603916.12.1997         Original published format: JP 34603997
JP1998033871430.11.1998         Original published format: JP 33871498
[2000/09]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9931747
Date:24.06.1999
Language:EN
[1999/25]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0982787
Date:01.03.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.06.1999
[2000/09]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0982787
Date:23.11.2011
Language:EN
[2011/47]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP24.06.1999
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.02.2005
ClassificationInternational:H01M4/62, H01M4/587, H01M4/133, H01M4/1393
[2011/47]
Former International [2011/28]H01M10/052
Former International [2000/09]H01M4/62, H01M4/58, H01M4/02, H01M4/04, H01M10/40
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2000/09]
TitleGerman:NICHTWÄSSRIGE, ELEKTROLYTISCHE SEKUNDÄRZELLE, NEGATIVE ELEKTRODE DAFÜR UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DER NEGATIVEN ELEKTRODE[2000/09]
English:NON-AQUEOUS ELECTROLYTE SECONDARY CELL, NEGATIVE ELECTRODE THEREFOR, AND METHOD OF PRODUCING NEGATIVE ELECTRODE[2000/09]
French:ACCUMULATEUR A ELECTROLYTE NON AQUEUX, SON ELECTRODE NEGATIVE ET PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION DE LADITE ELECTRODE[2011/30]
Former [2000/09]ELEMENT D'ACCUMULATEUR A ELECTROLYTE NON AQUEUX, SON ELECTRODE NEGATIVE ET PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION DE LADITE ELECTRODE
Entry into regional phase20.08.1999Translation filed 
10.09.1999National basic fee paid 
10.09.1999Search fee paid 
10.09.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
10.09.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.09.1999Examination requested  [2000/09]
17.10.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.01.2008Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.02.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.05.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.03.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.06.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.07.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.10.2011Fee for grant paid
06.10.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  17.10.2007
Opposition(s)24.08.2012No opposition filed within time limit [2012/44]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.12.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
17.12.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
27.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
23.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
16.12.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
16.12.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
15.12.2006Renewal fee patent year 09
10.12.2007Renewal fee patent year 10
20.03.2008Renewal fee patent year 11
22.12.2009Renewal fee patent year 12
28.12.2010Renewal fee patent year 13
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0627776  (SHARP KK [JP]) [X] 1-11,13-26 * page 4, line 54 - page 5, line 7 * * embodiments 1,3,5,7,11-13 * * claims 1,5,11,15 *;
 [X]US5672446  (BARKER JEREMY [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,5,11,13,15,16 * column 6, line 67 - column 7, line 33 *;
 [A]JPH06349482  ;
 [A]JPH04363866  ;
 [A]JPH07307153  ;
 [A]JPH09289022
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19950428), vol. 1995, no. 03, [A] 1-26 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930512), vol. 017, no. 234, Database accession no. (E - 1362), [A] 1-26 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19960329), vol. 1996, no. 03, [A] 1-26 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980227), vol. 1998, no. 03, [A] 1-26 * abstract *
International search[X]JPH06349482  (SHARP KK);
 [X]JPH04363866  (TOSHIBA BATTERY);
 [Y]JPH07307153  (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD);
 [X]JPH09289022  (SEIKO INSTR KK);
 [A]JPS6191871  (TOPPAN PRINTING CO LTD, et al);
 [A]JPH09199135  (NIPPON ZEON CO);
 [A]JPH0935707  (SHIN KOBE ELECTRIC MACHINERY)