Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1034272

EP1034272 - A cDNA ENCODING C6 $g(b)-CHEMOKINE LEUKOTACTIN-1(Lkn-1) ISOLATED FROM HUMAN [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  15.08.2003
Database last updated on 19.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip15.08.2003Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 01.10.2003  [2003/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
KOREA GREEN CROSS CORPORATION
227 Kugal-Ri, Kihung-Up Yongin-Kun
Kyongki-Do 449-900 / KR
[N/P]
Former [2000/37]For all designated states
KOREA GREEN CROSS CORPORATION
227 Kugal-Ri, Kihung-Up
Yongin-Kun, Kyongki-Do 449-900 / KR
Inventor(s)01 / KWON, Byoung, S.
812 Mountain Ash Court
Carmel, IN 46033 / US
02 / YOUN, Byung S.
460-5, Beon 1-dong
Kangbook-ku, Seoul 132-061 / KR
03 / CHUNG, Soo-Il
112-902 Hyundai Apartment, Seohyun-dong
Songnam, Kyonggi-do 463-050 / KR
04 / PARK, Doo-Hong
2754-3, Bangbae-2-dong
Seocho-ku, Seoul 137-062 / KR
05 / BAEK, Seung Jae
422-16, Shingal-ri, Kiheung-eup
Yongin, Kyonggi-do 449-900 / KR
06 / LEE, Eun-Kyoung
320-8, Cheonho 2-dong
Kangdong-ku, Seoul 134-022 / KR
[2000/37]
Representative(s)Woods, Geoffrey Corlett , et al
J A Kemp
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/37]Woods, Geoffrey Corlett , et al
J.A. KEMP & CO. Gray's Inn 14 South Square
London WC1R 5LX / GB
Application number, filing date98959235.727.11.1998
[2000/37]
WO1998KR00381
Priority number, dateKR1997006361027.11.1997         Original published format: KR 9763610
[2000/37]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9928473
Date:10.06.1999
Language:EN
[1999/23]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1034272
Date:13.09.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.06.1999
[2000/37]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:AT10.06.1999
ClassificationInternational:C12N15/19, C07K14/52, C12N5/10, A61K38/19
[2000/37]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/37]
TitleGerman:EINE AUS DEM MENSCHEN ISOLIERTE cDNA, DIE FÜR C6-BETA-CHEMOKIN LEUKOTAKTIN-1 (LKN-1) KODIERT[2000/37]
English:A cDNA ENCODING C6 $g(b)-CHEMOKINE LEUKOTACTIN-1(Lkn-1) ISOLATED FROM HUMAN[2000/37]
French:ADNc CODANT UNE C6 $g(b)-CHEMOKINE LEUKOTACTINE-1 (Lkn-1) ISOLEE D'UN ORGANISME HUMAIN[2000/37]
Biological materialThis application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details
Entry into regional phase21.06.2000National basic fee paid 
21.06.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
21.06.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.05.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: AT
21.06.2000Examination requested  [2000/38]
12.11.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.03.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/40]
29.04.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2003/40]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.11.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
14.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
13.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[A]WO9739126  (INCYTE PHARMA INC [US], et al);
 [A]WO9712041  (SMITHKLINE BEECHAM CORP [US], et al);
 [A]WO9639522  (HUMAN GENOME SCIENCES INC [US], et al);
 [A]WO9639521  (HUMAN GENOME SCIENCES INC [US], et al);
 [A]WO9639520  (HUMAN GENOME SCIENCES INC [US], et al)