Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1034601

EP1034601 - A METHOD OF APPLYING A TUBE MEMBER IN A STATOR SLOT IN A ROTATING ELECTRICAL MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  30.06.2006
Database last updated on 25.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip30.06.2006Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 02.08.2006  [2006/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ABB AB
721 83 Västerås / SE
[N/P]
Former [2000/37]For all designated states
ABB AB
721 83 Västeras / SE
Inventor(s)01 / LARSSON, Bertil
Sammetsvägen 12
S-724 76 Västeras / SE
02 / ROTHMAN, Bengt
Profilgatan 16
S-723 36 Västeras / SE
[2000/37]
Representative(s)Karlsson, Leif Karl Gunnar
L.A. Groth & Co. KB
Box 6107
102 32 Stockholm / SE
[N/P]
Former [2000/37]Karlsson, Leif Karl Gunnar
L.A. Groth & Co. KB, Box 6107
102 32 Stockholm / SE
Application number, filing date98959342.127.11.1998
[2000/37]
WO1998SE02162
Priority number, dateSE1997000438027.11.1997         Original published format: SE 9704380
[2000/37]
Filing languageSV
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9931781
Date:24.06.1999
Language:EN
[1999/25]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1034601
Date:13.09.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.06.1999
[2000/37]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE24.06.1999
ClassificationInternational:H02K3/24, H02K3/48
[2000/37]
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI [2000/37]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUM ANBRINGEN EINES ROHRFÖRMIGEN ELEMENTS IN EINEM STATORSCHLITZ IN EINER DREHENDEN ELEKTRISCHEN MASCHINE[2000/37]
English:A METHOD OF APPLYING A TUBE MEMBER IN A STATOR SLOT IN A ROTATING ELECTRICAL MACHINE[2000/37]
French:PROCEDE D'APPLICATION D'UN ELEMENT TUBULAIRE DANS L'ENCOCHE D'UN STATOR D'UNE MACHINE ELECTRIQUE TOURNANTE[2000/37]
Entry into regional phase24.06.1999Translation filed 
27.06.2000National basic fee paid 
27.06.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
27.06.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.06.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE
27.06.2000Examination requested  [2000/37]
26.06.2006Application withdrawn by applicant  [2006/31]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.11.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
14.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
13.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
12.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
12.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
14.11.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
Cited inInternational search[A]US5587126  (STEKETEE JR CAMPBELL H [US]);
 [A]FR2556146  (PARIS & DU RHONE [FR]);
 [AP]WO9745935  (ASEA BROWN BOVERI [SE], et al)