blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0956397

EP0956397 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR DETERMINING THE POSITION OF A WORKING PART [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.04.2004
Database last updated on 23.04.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip10.09.2004Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 27.10.2004  [2004/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Spectra Precision AB
Box 64
182 11 Danderyd / SE
[2003/22]
Former [1999/46]For all designated states
Spectra Precision AB
Box 64
S-182 11 Danderyd / SE
Inventor(s)01 / ERICSSON, Lars
Ravinvägen 7
S-187 34 Täby / SE
02 / HERTZMAN, Mikael
Skansvägen 58
S-191 43 Sollentuna / SE
[1999/46]
Representative(s)Herbjo̸rnsen, Rut
Zacco Sweden AB
Valhallavägen 117
Box 5581
114 85 Stockholm / SE
[N/P]
Former [2003/27]Herbjörnsen, Rut
Albihns Stockholm Ab P.O. Box 5581
114 85 Stockholm / SE
Former [1999/46]Forssell, Gunilla
Albihns Patentbyra Stockholm AB, Box 5581
114 85 Stockholm / SE
Application number, filing date98959348.827.11.1998
[1999/46]
WO1998SE02168
Priority number, dateSE1997000439728.11.1997         Original published format: SE 9704397
[1999/46]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO9928566
Date:10.06.1999
Language:EN
[1999/23]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0956397
Date:17.11.1999
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.06.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[1999/46]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0956397
Date:28.05.2003
Language:EN
[2003/22]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE10.06.1999
ClassificationIPC:E02F3/84, // E02F9:20
[1999/46]
CPC:
E02F9/2045 (EP,US); E02F3/842 (EP,US); E02F3/847 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   LI [1999/46]
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR BESTIMMUNG DER POSITION EINEN BEDIENUNGSTEILES[1999/46]
English:DEVICE AND METHOD FOR DETERMINING THE POSITION OF A WORKING PART[1999/46]
French:DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDE PERMETTANT DE DETERMINER LA POSITION D'UNE PIECE DE TRAVAIL[1999/46]
Entry into regional phase02.07.1999National basic fee paid 
02.07.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
02.07.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.07.1999Examination requested  [1999/46]
31.10.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
27.02.2003Fee for grant paid
27.02.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)02.03.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/21]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.11.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
20.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
20.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCH30.11.2003
LI30.11.2003
[2004/44]
Cited inInternational search[A]WO9401812  (CONTRACTOR TOOLS AB [SE], et al);
 [A]EP0811727  (TOPCON CORP [JP])
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.