Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1032813

EP1032813 - APPARATUS AND METHODS FOR MEASURING FLUORESCENCE POLARIZATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  10.10.2003
Database last updated on 19.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip10.10.2003Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 26.11.2003  [2003/48]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LJL Biosystems, Inc.
404 Tasman Drive
Sunnyvale, CA 94089 / US
[2000/36]
Inventor(s)01 / MODLIN, Douglas, N.
4063 Scripps Avenue
Palo Alto, CA 94036 / US
02 / OWICKI, John, C.
956 North California Avenue
Palo Alto, CA 94303 / US
[2000/36]
Representative(s)HGF Limited
1 City Walk
Leeds LS11 9DX / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/36]Harrison Goddard Foote
Tower House, Merrion Way
Leeds LS2 8PA / GB
Application number, filing date98959374.430.10.1998
[2000/36]
WO1998US23095
Priority number, dateUS19970063811P31.10.1997         Original published format: US 63811 P
US19980072499P26.01.1998         Original published format: US 72499 P
US19980072780P27.01.1998         Original published format: US 72780 P
US19980075414P20.02.1998         Original published format: US 75414 P
US19980075806P24.02.1998         Original published format: US 75806 P
US1998006247217.04.1998         Original published format: US 62472
US19980082253P17.04.1998         Original published format: US 82253 P
US19980084167P04.05.1998         Original published format: US 84167 P
US19980085335P13.05.1998         Original published format: US 85335 P
US19980085500P14.05.1998         Original published format: US 85500 P
US19980089848P19.06.1998         Original published format: US 89848 P
US19980092203P09.07.1998         Original published format: US 92203 P
US19980094275P27.07.1998         Original published format: US 94275 P
US19980094276P27.07.1998         Original published format: US 94276 P
US1998015631818.09.1998         Original published format: US 156318
US19980100951P18.09.1998         Original published format: US 100951 P
US19980100817P18.09.1998         Original published format: US 100817 P
US1998016053324.09.1998         Original published format: US 160533
US19980104964P20.10.1998         Original published format: US 104964 P
[2000/36]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO9923466
Date:14.05.1999
Language:EN
[1999/19]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1032813
Date:06.09.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.05.1999
[2000/36]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US19.08.1999
ClassificationInternational:G01N21/64, G01N21/21
[2000/43]
Former International [2000/36]G01N1/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/36]
TitleGerman:APPARAT UND METHODEN ZUR MESSUNG DER FLUORESZENZ-POLARISATION[2000/36]
English:APPARATUS AND METHODS FOR MEASURING FLUORESCENCE POLARIZATION[2000/36]
French:APPAREIL ET PROCEDES PERMETTANT DE MESURER LA POLARISATION DE FLUORESCENCE[2000/36]
Entry into regional phase30.05.2000National basic fee paid 
30.05.2000Search fee paid 
30.05.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
30.05.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure24.05.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
30.05.2000Examination requested  [2000/36]
03.05.2003Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/48]
16.06.2003Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2003/48]
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.10.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
17.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.10.200205   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[A]US4699512  ;
 [A]US4451149  ;
 [A]US4203670