EP1036084 - CHEMICAL SYNTHESIS OF 6-O-ALKYL ERYTHROMYCIN C [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.05.2003 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 03.09.2008 [2008/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ABBOTT LABORATORIES 100 Abbott Park Road Abbott Park, IL 60064-3500 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/36] | For all designated states ABBOTT LABORATORIES CHAD 0377/AP6D-2 100 Abbott Park Road Abbott Park IL 60064-3500 / US | ||
Former [2000/38] | For all designated states ABBOTT LABORATORIES CHAD 0377/AP6D-2, 100 Abbott Park Road Abbott Park, IL 60064-6050 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MONTGOMERY, Stephen, H. 302 Angela Court Vernon Hills, IL 60061 / US | 02 /
IVES, Michael, D. 361 Harding Street Desiance, OH 43512 / US | 03 /
LIU, Jih-Hua 31645 Rein Court Green Oaks, IL 60048 / US | [2000/38] | Representative(s) | Modiano, Guido, et al Modiano, Josif, Pisanty & Staub Ltd., Baaderstrasse 3 80469 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/38] | Modiano, Guido, Dr.-Ing., et al Modiano, Josif, Pisanty & Staub, Baaderstrasse 3 80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 98959495.7 | 17.11.1998 | [2000/38] | WO1998US24601 | Priority number, date | US19970982214 | 01.12.1997 Original published format: US 982214 | [2000/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9928333 | Date: | 10.06.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1036084 | Date: | 20.09.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.06.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.06.1999 | Classification | IPC: | C07H17/08 | [2000/38] | CPC: |
C07H17/08 (EP,KR);
C07H1/00 (KR);
A61P31/04 (EP);
Y02P20/55 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [2000/38] | Title | German: | CHEMISCHE SYNTHESE VON 6-O-ALKYL ERYTHROMYCIN C | [2000/38] | English: | CHEMICAL SYNTHESIS OF 6-O-ALKYL ERYTHROMYCIN C | [2000/38] | French: | SYNTHESE CHIMIQUE DE 6-O-ALKYLE ERYTHROMYCINE C | [2000/38] | Entry into regional phase | 29.05.2000 | National basic fee paid | 29.05.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.05.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.06.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 29.05.2000 | Examination requested [2000/38] | 28.08.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.01.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/28] | 11.02.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2003/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2002 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0137132 (PLIVA PHARM & CHEM WORKS [YU]) [X] 9 * examples 1,2 *; | [XA]EP0194833 (BEECHAM GROUP PLC [GB]) [X] 9 * claim 1 * * claim 9 * [A] 1; | [A]US4990602 (MORIMOTO SHIGEO [JP], et al) [A] 1* examples 14,30 *; | [XA]WO9742204 (ABBOTT LAB [US]) [X] 9 * examples 10A,16A,16B * * see claim 1, formula (II) * * claim 37 * [A] 1 |