Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0993648

EP0993648 - METHODS AND APPARATUS FOR WRITING TO TRACKS ON MAGNETIC-STRIPE CARDS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  29.11.2002
Database last updated on 20.01.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip29.11.2002Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 15.01.2003  [2003/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Innovonics, Inc.
Suite 200, 21644 North 9th Avenue
Phoenix, AZ 85027-2824 / US
[2000/16]
Inventor(s)01 / CLARK, Dereck, B.
3642 W. Camino Real
Glendale, AZ 85310 / US
[2000/16]
Representative(s)Hanna, Peter William Derek
Hanna Moore + Curley
Garryard House
25/26 Earlsfort Terrace
Dublin 2, D02 PX51 / IE
[N/P]
Former [2001/12]Hanna, Peter William Derek
Peter Hanna Associates 11 Mespil Road
Dublin 4 / IE
Former [2001/05]Walsh, Michael Joseph , et al
TOMKINS & CO. 5, Dartmouth Road
Dublin 6 / IE
Former [2000/16]Shortt, Peter Bernard , et al
TOMKINS & CO., 5 Dartmouth Road
Dublin 6 / IE
Application number, filing date98959633.330.11.1998
[2000/16]
WO1998US25349
Priority number, dateUS19970067016P01.12.1997         Original published format: US 67016 P
[2000/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9928851
Date:10.06.1999
Language:EN
[1999/23]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0993648
Date:19.04.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.06.1999
[2000/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US10.06.1999
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.06.2002
ClassificationInternational:G06K7/08, G06K1/12
[2002/32]
Former International [2000/16]G06K7/08
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IE,   IT [2000/16]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND GERÄT ZUM SCHREIBEN AUF SPUREN VON MAGNETSTREIFENKARTEN[2000/16]
English:METHODS AND APPARATUS FOR WRITING TO TRACKS ON MAGNETIC-STRIPE CARDS[2000/16]
French:PROCEDES ET APPAREIL PERMETTANT D'ECRIRE SUR DES PISTES DE CARTES A PISTES MAGNETIQUES[2000/16]
Entry into regional phase18.02.2000National basic fee paid 
18.02.2000Search fee paid 
18.02.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
18.02.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure18.02.2000Examination requested  [2000/16]
03.06.2002Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2003/03]
24.07.2002Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2003/03]
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.10.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973
19.01.2000DE   M01   Fee paid on   18.02.2000
19.01.2000ES   M01   Fee paid on   18.02.2000
19.01.2000FR   M01   Fee paid on   18.02.2000
19.01.2000GB   M01   Fee paid on   18.02.2000
19.01.2000IE   M01   Fee paid on   18.02.2000
19.01.2000IT   M01   Fee paid on   18.02.2000
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
19.01.2000M01   Fee paid on   18.02.2000
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.11.200104   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[A]GB2015218  (CUBIC WESTERN DATA) [A] 1,3 * page 1, column 114 - page 2, column 28 *;
 [A]US3864754  (MIKLOS RICHARD L, et al) [A] 1,3 * column 5, lines 12-53; figure 4 *;
 [A]JPH0684105
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940629), vol. 018, no. 346, Database accession no. (P - 1762), [A] 1,3,6 * abstract *
International search[Y]US5286958  (SMEETS JACQUES [FR]);
 [Y]US5204513  (STEELE GEORGE R [US]);
 [A]US5028768  (KEVORKIAN JEAN-MICHEL [FR], et al);
 [Y]US4634848  (SHINOHARA YOSHITSUGU [JP], et al);
 [Y]US4507550  (FLEER THOMAS P [US]);
 [Y]US4304992  (KOBAYASHI HIROMASA, et al)