Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1037854

EP1037854 - PROCESS FOR THE PURIFICATION OF LITHIUM CARBONATE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.03.2006
Database last updated on 17.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip14.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 16.04.2008  [2008/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Limtech Carbonate Inc.
5352 Burrill, P.O.Box 21009 Shawinigan
Quebec G9N 8M7 / CA
[N/P]
Former [2004/27]For all designated states
Limtech Carbonate Inc.
5352 Burrill, P.O.Box 21009
Shawinigan, Quebec G9N 8M7 / CA
Former [2004/24]For all designated states
Limtech Carbonate Inc.
1151 Rebecca
Cap Rouge, Quebec G1Y 3P8 / CA
Former [2000/39]For all designated states
Limtech
1151 Rebecca
Cap Rouge, Quebec G1Y 3P8 / CA
Inventor(s)01 / AMOUZEGAR Kamyab
apartment 25,3600 Place Masson
Shawinigan, Quebec G9N 7P7 / CA
02 / HARRISON, Stephen
1495 des Erables
Shawinigan, Quebec G9N 1B3 / CA
03 / ST. AMANT, Guy
3760 Bayonne Trois Rivieres West
Shawinigan, Quebec G8Y 6N7 / CA
[2000/39]
Representative(s)Burford, Anthony Frederick
Beck Greener
Fulwood House
12 Fulwood Place
London
WC1V 6HR / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/39]Burford, Anthony Frederick
W.H. Beck, Greener & Co. 7 Stone Buildings Lincoln's Inn
London WC2A 3SZ / GB
Application number, filing date98959684.607.12.1998
[2000/39]
WO1998CA01132
Priority number, dateUS19970069165P09.12.1997         Original published format: US 69165 P
US1998014333028.08.1998         Original published format: US 143330
[2000/39]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9929624
Date:17.06.1999
Language:EN
[1999/24]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1037854
Date:27.09.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.06.1999
[2000/39]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1037854
Date:27.04.2005
Language:EN
[2005/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP17.06.1999
ClassificationInternational:C01D15/08
[2000/39]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/39]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR REINIGUNG VON LITHIUMCARBONAT[2000/39]
English:PROCESS FOR THE PURIFICATION OF LITHIUM CARBONATE[2000/39]
French:PROCEDE DE PURIFICATION DU CARBONATE DE LITHIUM[2000/39]
Entry into regional phase19.06.2000National basic fee paid 
19.06.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
19.06.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.06.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
19.06.2000Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
19.06.2000Examination requested  [2000/39]
09.01.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
17.07.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.05.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
21.11.2002Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.10.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.02.2005Fee for grant paid
11.02.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)30.01.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.12.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
17.12.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
09.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
08.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
04.12.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipES27.04.2005
FI27.04.2005
IT27.04.2005
NL27.04.2005
DK27.07.2005
GR27.07.2005
SE27.07.2005
PT10.10.2005
CY07.12.2005
MC31.12.2005
[2008/16]
Former [2007/21]ES27.04.2005
FI27.04.2005
NL27.04.2005
DK27.07.2005
GR27.07.2005
SE27.07.2005
PT10.10.2005
CY07.12.2005
MC31.12.2005
Former [2007/18]ES27.04.2005
FI27.04.2005
NL27.04.2005
DK27.07.2005
GR27.07.2005
SE27.07.2005
PT10.10.2005
MC31.12.2005
Former [2006/40]FI27.04.2005
NL27.04.2005
DK27.07.2005
GR27.07.2005
SE27.07.2005
PT10.10.2005
MC31.12.2005
Former [2006/22]FI27.04.2005
NL27.04.2005
DK27.07.2005
GR27.07.2005
SE27.07.2005
PT10.10.2005
Former [2006/14]FI27.04.2005
DK27.07.2005
GR27.07.2005
SE27.07.2005
PT10.10.2005
Former [2006/13]FI27.04.2005
DK27.07.2005
SE27.07.2005
Former [2005/52]FI27.04.2005
SE27.07.2005
Former [2005/50]SE27.07.2005
Cited inInternational search[X]US3857920  (GRANTHAM L, et al) [X] 1-26 * column 2, line 66 - column 3, line 22 * * column 6, line 63 - column 7, line 57 *;
 [X]JPS62252315  ;
 [X]GB2190668  (METAUX SPECIAUX SA) [X] 1,14 * the whole document *;
 [A]JPS62161973  ;
 [A]JPS61251511  ;
 [DA]US4207297  (BROWN PATRICK M [US], et al) [DA] 1,14 * column 1, line 60 - column 2, line 8 * * example -; claim - *
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880422), vol. 012, no. 132, Database accession no. (C - 490), [X] 1,14 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19880108), vol. 012, no. 005, Database accession no. (C - 467), [A] 1,14 * abstract *
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19870331), vol. 011, no. 101, Database accession no. (C - 413), [A] 1,14 * abstract *