Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1025664

EP1025664 - RADIO RECEIVER WITH A HARD DISK DRIVE, A READ/WRITE MEMORY AND A DISPLAY DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  11.07.2008
Database last updated on 20.10.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip11.07.2008Refusal of applicationpublished on 13.08.2008  [2008/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ROBERT BOSCH GMBH
Postfach 30 02 20
70442 Stuttgart / DE
[2000/32]
Inventor(s)01 / ESCHKE, Bernd
Butenbergsfeld 1
D-31162 Bad Salzdetfurth / DE
02 / FISCHER, Hans-Jürgen
Sensburger Ring 56a
D-31141 Hildesheim / DE
03 / GEISELHART, Peter
Martin-Boyken-Ring 23
D-31141 Hildesheim / DE
04 / WIETZKE, Joachim
Ludwig-Erhard-Ring 10
D-31141 Hildesheim / DE
[2000/32]
Application number, filing date98959745.522.10.1998
[2000/32]
WO1998DE03083
Priority number, dateDE199714659722.10.1997         Original published format: DE 19746597
[2000/32]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9921306
Date:29.04.1999
Language:EN
[1999/17]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1025664
Date:09.08.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.04.1999
[2000/32]
Search report(s)International search reportEP29.04.1999
ClassificationInternational:H04H1/00, G08G1/09, G08G1/0969, G01C21/20
[2000/32]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2000/32]
TitleGerman:RUNDFUNKEMPFÄNGER MIT EINEM FESTPLATTENLAUFWERK, EINEM SCHREIB-/LESESPEICHER UND EINER ANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG[2000/32]
English:RADIO RECEIVER WITH A HARD DISK DRIVE, A READ/WRITE MEMORY AND A DISPLAY DEVICE[2000/32]
French:RECEPTEUR RADIO COMPORTANT UNE UNITE DE DISQUE DUR, UNE MEMOIRE VIVE ET UN DISPOSITIF D'AFFICHAGE[2000/32]
Entry into regional phase22.05.2000National basic fee paid 
22.05.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
22.05.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.05.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
22.05.2000Examination requested  [2000/32]
03.03.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
09.09.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.01.2006Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2008/33]
27.05.2008Application refused, date of legal effect [2008/33]
Appeal following examination22.03.2006Appeal received No.  T1076/06
02.06.2006Statement of grounds filed
27.05.2008Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant was rejected
27.05.2008Date of oral proceedings
29.05.2008Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
27.05.2008Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.10.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
31.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
31.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
31.10.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
02.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
31.10.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
31.10.2006Renewal fee patent year 09
31.10.2007Renewal fee patent year 10
Cited inInternational search[X]DE3805810  (AMEND VOLKER [DE], et al) [X] 1-11 * abstract * * column 6, line 10 - line 19 * * column 10, line 13 - column 12, line 59 * * column 14, line 12 - line 52 * * figure 1 *;
 [X]DE4218804  (VDO SCHINDLING [DE]) [X] 1-11 * abstract * * column 3, line 21 - column 5, line 25 * * claims 1-3,5,6,16 * * figures 1,2 *;
 [XA]EP0702210  (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES [JP]) [X] 1,3,7-11 * abstract * * page 3, line 43 - line 52 * * page 6, line 51 - page 7, line 2 * * figure 1 * [A] 2,6;
 [PX]DE19803253  (ANY CO [JP]) [PX] 1-3,7,9,11 * abstract * * column 1, line 66 - column 5, line 22 *