Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1031000

EP1031000 - FUEL COMBUSTION METHOD AND REACTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  05.07.2002
Database last updated on 18.08.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip05.07.2002No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 21.08.2002  [2002/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Gourmeli International N.V.
Cararasbaaiweg 199
Curaçao / AN
[2000/35]
Inventor(s)01 / STAFFLER, Franz, Josef
Raingasse 7
I-39100 Bozen / IT
02 / BRANZI, Vincenzo
Centrale 1
38027 Terzolas TN / IT
 [2002/24]
Former [2000/35]01 / STAFFLER, Franz, Josef
Raingasse 7
I-39100 Bozen / IT
Representative(s)Grunert, Marcus
Hössle Kudlek & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 10 23 38
70019 Stuttgart / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/42]Grunert, Marcus, Dipl.-Phys.
Hössle & Kudlek Holzstrasse 26
80469 München / DE
Application number, filing date98959868.510.11.1998
[2000/35]
WO1998EP07175
Priority number, dateDE199714968810.11.1997         Original published format: DE 19749688
[2000/35]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9924756
Date:20.05.1999
Language:DE
[1999/20]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1031000
Date:30.08.2000
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.05.1999
[2000/35]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1031000
Date:29.08.2001
Language:DE
[2001/35]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP20.05.1999
ClassificationInternational:F23L7/00, F23G7/05, F23C11/00, F23C3/00
[2000/35]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/35]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND REAKTOR ZUR VERBRENNUNG VON BRENNSTOFFEN[2000/35]
English:FUEL COMBUSTION METHOD AND REACTOR[2000/35]
French:DISPOSITIF ET REACTEUR POUR LA COMBUSTION DE COMBUSTIBLES[2000/35]
Entry into regional phase09.06.2000National basic fee paid 
09.06.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
09.06.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure31.03.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
09.06.2000Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
09.06.2000Examination requested  [2000/35]
05.09.2000Request for accelerated examination filed
20.09.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.09.2000Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes
22.01.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.02.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
22.05.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
22.05.2001Fee for grant paid
22.05.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
29.06.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
Opposition(s)30.05.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2002/34]
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.06.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
03.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[A]DE2153817  (GAIDIES KURT) [A] 1,19 * page 5, paragraph 3 * * page 8, paragraph 1 - paragraph 2; figure . *;
 [A]DE1917666  (WINTERSHALL AG [DE]) [A] 1,2 * page 1, paragraph 4 - page 2, paragraph 2; figure 1 *;
 [A]DE2118073  (HEURTEY) [A] 12-18 * the whole document *;
 [A]FR2349368  (CHARBONNAGES DE FRANCE [FR]) [A] 1,19 * the whole document *;
 [AD]US4069005  (PALANI NARAYANASWAMI) [AD] 7,10,11 * column 2, line 55 - line 59 * * column 8, line 43 - column 9, line 16; figure 1 *;
 [A]GB1507321  (KURESEN SANGYO KK) [A] 7,10,11 * the whole document *;
 [AD]GB765197  (BASF AG) [AD] * page 1, line 34 - line 63 * * page 1, line 83 - page 2, line 3 * * page 2, line 40 - line 42 * * page 2, line 66 - line 89; figures 1,2 *;
 [AD]US3804579  (WILHELM G)