Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1037587

EP1037587 - SITE-SPECIFIC PREPARATION OF POLYETHYLENE GLYCOL-GRF CONJUGATES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  13.02.2004
Database last updated on 25.04.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip13.02.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 31.03.2004  [2004/14]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Applied Research Systems ARS Holding N.V.
Pietermaai 15
Curaçao / AN
[N/P]
Former [2003/27]For all designated states
Applied Research Systems ARS Holding N.V.
Pietermaai 15
Curacao / AN
Former [2000/39]For all designated states
APPLIED RESEARCH SYSTEMS ARS HOLDING N.V.
14 John B. Gorsiraweg
Curaçao / AN
Inventor(s)01 / VERONESE, Francesco, Maria
Via Barozzi, 11/B
I-35128 Padova / IT
02 / CALICETI, Paolo
Via Gattamelata, 156/c Int. 1
I-35128 Padova / IT
03 / SCHIAVON, Oddone
Via Zago, 13
I-35128 Padova / IT
[2000/39]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2001/30]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Maximilianstrasse 58
80538 München / DE
Former [2000/39]Hassa, Jürgen
Ares-Serono International S.A., 12, Chemin des Aulx
1228 Plan-les-Ouates / CH
Application number, filing date98959898.201.12.1998
[2000/39]
WO1998EP07748
Priority number, dateEP1997012126403.12.1997         Original published format: EP 97121264
[2000/39]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9927897
Date:10.06.1999
Language:EN
[1999/23]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1037587
Date:27.09.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.06.1999
[2000/39]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1037587
Date:09.04.2003
Language:EN
[2003/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP10.06.1999
ClassificationInternational:A61K7/00
[2000/39]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/39]
Extension statesAL07.06.2000
LT07.06.2000
LV07.06.2000
MK07.06.2000
RO07.06.2000
SI07.06.2000
TitleGerman:HERSTELLUNG STELLEN-SPEZIFISCHER POLYETHYLENGLYCOL-GRF KONJUGATE[2002/48]
English:SITE-SPECIFIC PREPARATION OF POLYETHYLENE GLYCOL-GRF CONJUGATES[2000/39]
French:PREPARATION SPECIFIQUE A UN SITE DE CONJUGUES DE POLYETHYLENE GLYCOL-GRF[2000/39]
Former [2000/39]ORTSPEZIFISCHE VORBEREITUNG VON POLYETHYLENE GLYCOL-GRF KONJUGATEN
Entry into regional phase07.06.2000National basic fee paid 
07.06.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
07.06.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.06.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
07.06.2000Examination requested  [2000/39]
20.12.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
11.06.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.12.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
28.04.2002Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
08.07.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.09.2002Fee for grant paid
19.09.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)12.01.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/14]
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.07.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
13.12.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
12.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[X]EP0400472  (SUMITOMO PHARMA [JP], et al) [X] 1-20 * examples 18,19 *;
 [X]EP0473084  (SUMITOMO PHARMA [JP]) [X] 1-20 * example 13; claims 5,8,9,11 *;
 [XY]WO9717367  (THERATECHNOLOGIES INC [CA]) [X] 14,15 * page 4, line 28 - page 5, line 10; figure 1 * * tables 2,3 * [Y] 1-13;
 [XD]WO9621469  (SHEARWATER POLYMERS INC [US], et al) [XD] 1-20 * abstract * * page 66 *;
 [X]EP0518295  (MILLIPORE CORP [US]) [X] 14,15 * abstract *
 [YD]  - CAMPBELL RM ET AL, "Pegylated peptides. V. Carboxy-terminal PEGylated analogs of growth hormone-releasing factor (GRF) display enhanced duration of biological activity in vivo.", J PEPT RES, JUN 1997, 49 (6) P527-37, DENMARK, XP000657594 [YD] 1-20 * page 527, column 2 * * figure 2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1399-3011.1997.tb01160.x
 [XD]  - FELIX AM ET AL, "Pegylated peptides. IV. Enhanced biological activity of site-directed pegylated GRF analogs.", INT J PEPT PROTEIN RES, SEP-OCT 1995, 46 (3-4) P253-64, DENMARK, XP002064559 [XD] 1-20 * page 261 - page 263; figure 3; table 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1399-3011.1995.tb00597.x
 [Y]  - ZALIPSKY S, "CHEMISTRY OF POLYETHYLENE GLYCOL CONJUGATES WITH BIOLOGICALLY ACTIVE MOLECULES", ADVANCED DRUG DELIVERY REVIEWS, (1995), vol. 16, no. 2/03, pages 157 - 182, XP002037428 [Y] 1-20 * page 159 - page 161; figures 1,2 * * page 166, column 2 - page 168, column 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0169-409X(95)00023-Z
 [A]  - ZHANG C. ET AL, "Radioimmunoassay of growth hormone-releasing hormone (GHRH) with a polyclonal antibody against synthetic GHRH(1-29)-Gly4-Cys-NH2: Method and clinical studies", CLIN. CHIM. ACTA, 1991, 202/3 (243-254), NETHERLANDS, XP002064562 [A] 1-13 * abstract * * page 245, paragraph 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0009-8981(91)90055-H
 [Y]  - GAERTNER H F ET AL, "SITE-SPECIFIC ATTACHMENT OF FUNCTIONALIZED POLY(ETHYLENE GLYCOL) TOTHE AMINO TERMINUS OF PROTEINS", BIOCONJUGATE CHEMISTRY, (1996), vol. 7, no. 1, pages 38 - 44, XP000646874 [Y] 1-15 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/bc950074d
 [Y]  - FRANCIS G E ET AL, "POLYETHYLENE GLYCOL MODIFICATION: RELEVANCE OF IMPROVED METHODOLOGY TO TUMOUR TARGETING", JOURNAL OF DRUG TARGETING, (1996), vol. 3, pages 321 - 340, XP002058312 [Y] 1-20 * abstract *
 [X]  - FISCHER D ET AL, "PEG-PROTEIN CONSTRUCTS FOR CLINICAL USE", PERSPECTIVE PROTEIN ENG. COMPLEMENTARY TECHNOLOGY COLLECT PAPERS INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM, (1995), pages 223 - 226, XP002060507 [X] 16-20 * the whole document *