blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP1040382 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP1040382



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 67
08.04.2002 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
18.03.2002 Closing of application Search / examination 3
15.03.2002 Acknowledgement of withdrawal of the European patent application Search / examination 1
08.03.2002 Withdrawal of application Search / examination 1
06.12.2001 Indication of deficiencies in a request for registering a transfer of rights and invitation to correct them Search / examination 1
22.11.2001 Request for transfer of rights Search / examination 7
24.08.2000 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 1
24.08.2000 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 1
24.08.2000 Claims Search / examination 1
23.08.2000 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
21.08.2000 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
17.06.2000 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
17.06.2000 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
28.04.2000 Annexes to the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 2
28.04.2000 Copy of the international preliminary examination report Search / examination 6
29.07.1999 Priority document Search / examination 14
01.07.1999 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
17.06.1999 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
17.06.1999 International publication (Pamphlet) Search / examination 13