blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP1040382


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
15.03.2002 Withdrawal of application published on  02.05.2002  [2002/18]
08.01.2002 Renewal fee
11.01.2001 Renewal fee
30.08.2000 Amendment by applicant
18.08.2000 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  04.10.2000 [2000/40]
18.08.2000 Request for examination filed published on  04.10.2000 [2000/40]
13.07.2000 PCT data prior to European publication
04.07.2000 PCT data prior to European publication
04.08.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
10.07.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
25.06.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
07.04.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
20.01.1999 PCT data prior to European publication