blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP1040382
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP1040382Global Dossier 04.10.2000A1
Priority number Date
GB9726570 16.12.1997
GB9803688 16.12.1998
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO9931546Global Dossier 24.06.1999A1
Priority number Date
GB9726570 16.12.1997
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
GB9726570D 11.02.1998D0
Priority number Date
GB9726570 16.12.1997