Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1040382

EP1040382 - LIQUID-CRYSTAL DISPLAY USING UV LIGHT SOURCE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  15.03.2002
Database last updated on 22.09.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip15.03.2002Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 02.05.2002  [2002/18]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
THE SECRETARY OF STATE FOR DEFENCE
Defence Evaluation and Research Agency
Ively Road
Farnborough, Hampshire GU14 0LX / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/40]For all designated states
The Secretary of State for Defence
Defence Evaluation and Research Agency, Ively Road
Farnborough, Hampshire GU14 0LX / GB
Inventor(s)01 / VECHT, Aron
95 Corringham Road
London NW11 7DL / GB
02 / NEWPORT, Anne Christine
12 Ashton Road, Siddington
Cirencester, Gloucester GL7 6HA / GB
03 / BAYLEY, Paul, Andrew
65 Broomy Hill
Hereford HR4 0LJ / GB
[2000/40]
Representative(s)Gibbs, Christopher Stephen
Haseltine Lake LLP
Lincoln House, 5th Floor
300 High Holborn
London WC1V 7JH / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/40]Gibbs, Christopher Stephen
Haseltine Lake & Co. Imperial House 15-19 Kingsway
London WC2B 6UD / GB
Application number, filing date98960001.016.12.1998
[2000/40]
WO1998GB03688
Priority number, dateGB1997002657016.12.1997         Original published format: GB 9726570
[2000/40]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9931546
Date:24.06.1999
Language:EN
[1999/25]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1040382
Date:04.10.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.06.1999
[2000/40]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP24.06.1999
ClassificationInternational:G02F1/1335
[2000/40]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   NL [2000/40]
TitleGerman:FLÜSSIGKRISTALLANZEIGE, DIE EINE UV-LICHTQUELLE VERWENDET[2000/40]
English:LIQUID-CRYSTAL DISPLAY USING UV LIGHT SOURCE[2000/40]
French:AFFICHAGE A CRISTAUX LIQUIDES UTILISANT UNE SOURCE DE LUMIERE UV[2000/40]
Entry into regional phase05.07.2000National basic fee paid 
05.07.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
05.07.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.06.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
05.07.2000Examination requested  [2000/40]
24.08.2000Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
08.03.2002Application withdrawn by applicant  [2002/18]
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.12.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
19.12.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[Y]WO9740417  (SCREEN TECH LTD [GB], et al) [Y] 1-5,9 * page 9, line 24 - page 10, line 16; figure 2 *;
 [DYA]US3669897  (WACHTEL ANSELM) [DY] 1-5,9 * column 1, line 18 - line 41; figure 1; claim 3 * [A] 10,11;
 [DA]GB2291734  (SAMSUNG DISPLAY DEVICES CO LTD [KR]) [DA] 1-8 * page 4, line 16 - line 27 * * page 6, line 21 - page 8, line 27; figures 2,3 *;
 [DA]GB2154355  (RICOH KK) [DA] 1 * page 1, line 42 - page 2, line 5 * * page 3, line 4 - line 6; figure 19 *;
 [A]US5666174  (CUPOLO III ANTHONY M [US]) [A] 1 * the whole document *