EP1042060 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR CHEMICAL SYNTHESIS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.01.2003 Database last updated on 22.04.2025 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 16.04.2008 [2008/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kalibrant Limited 2 Oakwood Drive, Loughborough Park, Loughborough Leicester LE11 3NH / GB | [2000/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PALMER, Derek Adeyemi 8 Chiltern Avenue, Cove Farnborough, Hampshire GU14 9SE / GB | 02 /
FRENCH, Martin Thomas The Old Meeting House 111 Meeting Street Quorn, Leicestershire LE12 8AQ / GB | [2000/41] | Representative(s) | Kirkham, Nicholas Andrew, et al Graham Watt & Co. LLP St. Botolph's House 7-9 St. Botolph's Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 3AJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/41] | Kirkham, Nicholas Andrew, et al Graham Watt & Co., Riverhead Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 2BN / GB | Application number, filing date | 98960020.0 | 15.12.1998 | [2000/41] | WO1998GB03761 | Priority number, date | GB19970026482 | 15.12.1997 Original published format: GB 9726482 | [2000/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9930817 | Date: | 24.06.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1042060 | Date: | 11.10.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.06.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1042060 | Date: | 27.03.2002 | Language: | EN | [2002/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.06.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B01J19/00 | [2000/41] | CPC: |
B01J19/0046 (EP,KR,US);
B01J2219/00286 (EP,KR,US);
B01J2219/00306 (EP,KR,US);
B01J2219/00423 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00454 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00481 (EP,KR,US);
B01J2219/00495 (EP,KR,US);
B01J2219/005 (EP,US);
B01J2219/00585 (EP,US);
B01J2219/0059 (EP,KR,US);
B01J2219/00596 (EP,KR,US);
B01J2219/00698 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/41] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG FÜR CHEMISCHE SYNTHESE | [2000/41] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR CHEMICAL SYNTHESIS | [2000/41] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE SYNTHESE CHIMIQUE | [2000/41] | Entry into regional phase | 10.07.2000 | National basic fee paid | 10.07.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.07.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.07.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 29.06.2000 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.07.2000 | Examination requested [2000/41] | 08.03.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 14.09.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 01.10.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.12.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 18.12.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.12.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 27.03.2002 | BE | 27.03.2002 | CH | 27.03.2002 | FI | 27.03.2002 | FR | 27.03.2002 | GR | 27.03.2002 | IT | 27.03.2002 | LI | 27.03.2002 | NL | 27.03.2002 | DK | 27.06.2002 | PT | 27.06.2002 | SE | 27.06.2002 | DE | 28.06.2002 | ES | 25.09.2002 | GB | 15.12.2002 | LU | 15.12.2002 | IE | 16.12.2002 | [2008/16] |
Former [2006/14] | AT | 27.03.2002 | |
BE | 27.03.2002 | ||
CH | 27.03.2002 | ||
FI | 27.03.2002 | ||
FR | 27.03.2002 | ||
GR | 27.03.2002 | ||
LI | 27.03.2002 | ||
NL | 27.03.2002 | ||
DK | 27.06.2002 | ||
PT | 27.06.2002 | ||
SE | 27.06.2002 | ||
DE | 28.06.2002 | ||
ES | 25.09.2002 | ||
GB | 15.12.2002 | ||
LU | 15.12.2002 | ||
IE | 16.12.2002 | ||
Former [2004/39] | AT | 27.03.2002 | |
BE | 27.03.2002 | ||
CH | 27.03.2002 | ||
FI | 27.03.2002 | ||
GR | 27.03.2002 | ||
LI | 27.03.2002 | ||
NL | 27.03.2002 | ||
DK | 27.06.2002 | ||
PT | 27.06.2002 | ||
SE | 27.06.2002 | ||
DE | 28.06.2002 | ||
ES | 25.09.2002 | ||
GB | 15.12.2002 | ||
LU | 15.12.2002 | ||
IE | 16.12.2002 | ||
Former [2004/22] | AT | 27.03.2002 | |
BE | 27.03.2002 | ||
CH | 27.03.2002 | ||
FI | 27.03.2002 | ||
GR | 27.03.2002 | ||
LI | 27.03.2002 | ||
NL | 27.03.2002 | ||
DK | 27.06.2002 | ||
PT | 27.06.2002 | ||
SE | 27.06.2002 | ||
DE | 28.06.2002 | ||
ES | 25.09.2002 | ||
GB | 15.12.2002 | ||
IE | 16.12.2002 | ||
Former [2004/04] | AT | 27.03.2002 | |
BE | 27.03.2002 | ||
CH | 27.03.2002 | ||
FI | 27.03.2002 | ||
GR | 27.03.2002 | ||
LI | 27.03.2002 | ||
NL | 27.03.2002 | ||
DK | 27.06.2002 | ||
PT | 27.06.2002 | ||
SE | 27.06.2002 | ||
DE | 28.06.2002 | ||
ES | 25.09.2002 | ||
IE | 16.12.2002 | ||
Former [2004/02] | AT | 27.03.2002 | |
BE | 27.03.2002 | ||
CH | 27.03.2002 | ||
FI | 27.03.2002 | ||
GR | 27.03.2002 | ||
LI | 27.03.2002 | ||
NL | 27.03.2002 | ||
DK | 27.06.2002 | ||
PT | 27.06.2002 | ||
SE | 27.06.2002 | ||
DE | 28.06.2002 | ||
IE | 16.12.2002 | ||
Former [2003/46] | AT | 27.03.2002 | |
BE | 27.03.2002 | ||
CH | 27.03.2002 | ||
FI | 27.03.2002 | ||
GR | 27.03.2002 | ||
LI | 27.03.2002 | ||
NL | 27.03.2002 | ||
DK | 27.06.2002 | ||
PT | 27.06.2002 | ||
SE | 27.06.2002 | ||
DE | 28.06.2002 | ||
Former [2003/30] | AT | 27.03.2002 | |
BE | 27.03.2002 | ||
CH | 27.03.2002 | ||
FI | 27.03.2002 | ||
GR | 27.03.2002 | ||
LI | 27.03.2002 | ||
NL | 27.03.2002 | ||
PT | 27.06.2002 | ||
SE | 27.06.2002 | ||
DE | 28.06.2002 | ||
Former [2003/21] | AT | 27.03.2002 | |
BE | 27.03.2002 | ||
CH | 27.03.2002 | ||
FI | 27.03.2002 | ||
GR | 27.03.2002 | ||
LI | 27.03.2002 | ||
NL | 27.03.2002 | ||
PT | 27.06.2002 | ||
SE | 27.06.2002 | ||
Former [2003/19] | AT | 27.03.2002 | |
BE | 27.03.2002 | ||
CH | 27.03.2002 | ||
FI | 27.03.2002 | ||
GR | 27.03.2002 | ||
LI | 27.03.2002 | ||
NL | 27.03.2002 | ||
SE | 27.06.2002 | ||
Former [2003/16] | AT | 27.03.2002 | |
BE | 27.03.2002 | ||
CH | 27.03.2002 | ||
FI | 27.03.2002 | ||
LI | 27.03.2002 | ||
NL | 27.03.2002 | ||
SE | 27.06.2002 | ||
Former [2003/09] | AT | 27.03.2002 | |
BE | 27.03.2002 | ||
FI | 27.03.2002 | ||
NL | 27.03.2002 | ||
SE | 27.06.2002 | ||
Former [2003/06] | BE | 27.03.2002 | |
FI | 27.03.2002 | ||
NL | 27.03.2002 | ||
SE | 27.06.2002 | ||
Former [2002/49] | FI | 27.03.2002 | |
SE | 27.06.2002 | ||
Former [2002/37] | SE | 27.06.2002 | Cited in | International search | [XA]WO8501224 (SANEII HOSSAIN H) [X] 1-6,10-14,17,18,20-22 * abstract * * page 7, line 24 - page 10, line 32 * * page 12, line 13 - page 14, line 5 * * page 21, line 25 - page 23, line 11 * * page 37, line 8 - line 22 * * page 46, line 12 - line 23 * * page 47, line 23 - page 48, line 12 * * figures 2,2A,3,4,6 * [A] 7-9,15,16,19; | [A]FR2630928 (RHONE POULENC CHIMIE [FR]); | [A]WO9117823 (PROTOS CORP [US]) [A] 1-22 * page 8, line 13 - page 20, line 31 * * figure - *; | [DA]WO9512608 (AFFYMAX TECH NV [NL], et al) [DA] 1-22; | [XA]WO9707126 (HYBRIDON INC [US]) [X] 1,6,10 * page 7, line 15 - page 8, line 36 * * page 10, line 19 - page 12, line 14 * * figures 1,2 * [A] 2-5,7-9,11-22; | [XA]WO9706884 (PHARMACIA BIOTECH AB [SE]) [X] 1,6,10 * page 6, line 28 - page 14, line 14 * * figure - * [A] 2-5,7,11-22; | [A]EP0794001 (PERKIN ELMER CORP [US]) [A] 1-22 * the whole document * |