Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1037713

EP1037713 - METHOD OF PRODUCING HOLLOW DROPLETS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2000/39]DEVICE AND METHOD FOR CREATING DRY PARTICLES
[2001/37]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.05.2003
Database last updated on 22.06.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip16.05.2003No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 02.07.2003  [2003/27]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Universidad de Sevilla
Vicerrectorado de Investigacion, Valparaiso, 5-2 planta
41013 Sevilla / ES
[2000/39]
Inventor(s)01 / GANAN CALVO, Alfonso
Camilo Jose Cela, n 4, Bloque 8, 3 A
E-41018 Sevilla / ES
[2000/39]
Representative(s)Price, Nigel John King , et al
J A Kemp
14 South Square
Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5JJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/39]Price, Nigel John King , et al
J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5LX / GB
Application number, filing date98960047.316.12.1998
[2000/39]
WO1998IB02054
Priority number, dateES1997000265417.12.1997         Original published format: ES 9702654
US1998019159213.11.1998         Original published format: US 191592
[2000/39]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9930833
Date:24.06.1999
Language:EN
[1999/25]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1037713
Date:27.09.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.06.1999
[2000/39]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1037713
Date:10.07.2002
Language:EN
[2002/28]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP24.06.1999
ClassificationInternational:B05B7/06, A61M15/00, B01J2/04, B01D1/18
[2000/39]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB [2000/39]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR ERZEUGUNG VON HOHLEN TRÖPFCHEN[2001/37]
English:METHOD OF PRODUCING HOLLOW DROPLETS[2001/37]
French:PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION DE GOUTTELETTES CREUSES[2001/37]
Former [2000/39]VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR ERZEUGUNG EINES FESTSTOFFAEROSOLS
Former [2000/39]DEVICE AND METHOD FOR CREATING DRY PARTICLES
Former [2000/39]DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDE POUR CREER DES PARTICULES SECHES
Entry into regional phase15.06.2000National basic fee paid 
15.06.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
15.06.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.07.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
15.06.2000Examination requested  [2000/39]
18.12.2000Request for accelerated examination filed
01.02.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.02.2001Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes
05.06.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.08.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
17.01.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.04.2002Fee for grant paid
04.04.2002Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)11.04.2003No opposition filed within time limit [2003/27]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.12.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
13.12.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[XA]WO9744080  (GLAXO GROUP LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1 * page 1, line 8 - line 14 * * page 11, line 29 - page 14, line 22; figure 2 * [A] 2;
 [XA]WO9743048  (UNIV SEVILLA [ES], et al) [X] 3,4,10-14 * page 4, line 13 - page 5, line 6 * * page 6, line 4 - line 6 * * page 6, line 18 - line 22 * * page 7, line 4 - line 24 * * page 9, line 23 - line 27 * * page 10, line 8 - page 11, line 12; figure .; claims 2-13 * [A] 1,2;
 [X]US3700170  (BLANKA DOHNALOVA-BINKOVA, et al) [X] 15 * column 3, line 28 - line 45 * * column 5, line 6 - line 30 *;
 [A]WO9523030  (FLOW RESEARCH EVALUATION DIAGN [GB], et al) [A] 6 * page 8, line 20 - line 27; figure 9 *;
 [A]US4352789  (THIEL CHARLES G) [A] 15 * column 1, line 62 - column 2, line 16 * * column 4, line 21 - line 32 * * column 13, line 1 - line 10 *
 [A]  - BRENN G.; HELPIOE T.; DURST F., "New apparatus for the production of monodisperse sprays at high flow rates", DATABASE COMPENDEX, ENGINEERING INFORMATION, INC., NEW YORK, NY, US, (199701), XP002096487 [A] 5,15 * abstract *
    [] - BRENN G.; HELPIOE T.; DURST F., "New apparatus for the production of monodisperse sprays at high flow rates", CHEMICAL ENGINEERING SCIENCE, (199701), vol. 52, no. 2, pages 237 - 244,
by applicantEP0250164
 US5829436
 US5514646
 US5700662
    - S.NUKIYAMA AND T.TANASAWA, TRANS.SOC.MECH.ENG.JPN., (1939), no. 5, pages 68 - 75,
    - I.D.WIGG, J.INST.FUEL., (1964), no. 27, pages 500 - 505,
    - G.E.LORENZETTO AND A.H.LEFEBVRE., AIAA J., (1977), no. 15, pages 1006 - 1010,
    - A.K.JASUJA, ASME PAPER 82-GT-32., (1982),
    - N.K.RISK AND A.H.LEFEBVRE., TRANS ASME J. ENG. GAS TURBINES POWER., (1983), no. 106, pages 639 - 644,
    - A.UNAL, METALL. TRANS. B., (1989), no. 20B, pages 613 - 622,
    - J.AUSTRAL.MATH.SOC.SER.B., (1984), no. 25, pages 433 - 450,
    - L.K.FORBES AND G.C.HOCKING, J.AUSTRAL.MATH.SOC.SER.B., (1990), no. 32, pages 231 - 249,
    - T.J.SINGLER AND J.F.GEER SINGLER, PHYS.FLUIDS A, (1993), no. 5, pages 1156 - 1166,
    - PHYSICANS DESK REFERENCE, (1998),
    - REMINGTON, THE SCIENCE AND PRACTICE OF PHARMACY 19TH EDITION, (1995),
    - RAYLEIGH, "ON THE INSTABILITY OF JETS", PROC. LONDON MATH. SOC., (1878), pages 4 - 13,
    - GANAN-CALVO, PHYSICAL REVIEW LETTERS, (1998), no. 80, pages 285 - 288,
    - HINDS, "AEROSOL TECHNOLOGY", OHNESORGE AND WEBER, (1982),
    - LEFEVRE, "ATOMIZATION AND SPRAYS", OHNESORGE AND WEBER, (1989),
    - BAYVEL & ORZECHOWSKI, "LIQUID ATOMIZATION", OHNESORGE AND WEBER, (1993),
 WO1988US02289