Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1100358

EP1100358 - SYNCHRONOUS LOCKING MECHANISM OF BACK-REST AND SEAT ANGULAR POSITION WITH RESPECT TO FOOT COLUMN, PARTICULARLY FOR CHAIRS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.06.2004
Database last updated on 15.12.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip14.03.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 16.04.2008  [2008/16]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Wronski, Slawomir
ul. Bohaterow Monte Cassino, 8
94 236 Lodz / PL
[2001/21]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2001/21]
Representative(s)Chaillot, Geneviève
Cabinet Chaillot
16-20 Avenue de l'Agent Sarre
B.P. 74
92703 Colombes Cedex / FR
[N/P]
Former [2001/21]Chaillot, Geneviève
Cabinet CHAILLOT, 16-20, avenue de L'Agent Sarre, B.P. 74
92703 Colombes Cédex / FR
Application number, filing date98960124.031.12.1998
[2001/21]
WO1998PL00053
Priority number, datePL1998032771425.07.1998         Original published format: PL 32771498
[2001/21]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO0005997
Date:10.02.2000
Language:EN
[2000/06]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1100358
Date:23.05.2001
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.02.2000
[2001/21]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1100358
Date:20.08.2003
Language:EN
[2003/34]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP10.02.2000
ClassificationInternational:A47C1/026
[2001/21]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2001/21]
Extension statesLT22.02.2001
LV22.02.2001
MK22.02.2001
SI22.02.2001
TitleGerman:SYNCHRONVERSTELLMECHANISMUS FÜR DIE NEIGUNG DER RÜCKENLEHNE UND SITZ, INSBESONDERE FÜR EINEN STUHL[2001/21]
English:SYNCHRONOUS LOCKING MECHANISM OF BACK-REST AND SEAT ANGULAR POSITION WITH RESPECT TO FOOT COLUMN, PARTICULARLY FOR CHAIRS[2001/21]
French:MECANISME DE BLOCAGE SYNCHRONE DE LA POSITION ANGULAIRE D'UN DOSSIER ET D'UN SIEGE PAR RAPPORT AU PIED SPECIALEMENT CON U POUR LES CHAISES[2001/21]
Entry into regional phase22.02.2001National basic fee paid 
22.02.2001Designation fee(s) paid 
22.02.2001Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.03.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
23.02.2001Examination requested  [2001/21]
22.11.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.03.2003Fee for grant paid
24.03.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)24.05.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/33]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.02.2001Renewal fee patent year 03
11.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
31.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.200104   M06   Fee paid on   11.02.2002
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT20.08.2003
BE20.08.2003
CH20.08.2003
FI20.08.2003
FR20.08.2003
IT20.08.2003
LI20.08.2003
NL20.08.2003
DK20.11.2003
GR20.11.2003
SE20.11.2003
DE21.11.2003
ES01.12.2003
CY31.12.2003
GB31.12.2003
IE31.12.2003
LU31.12.2003
MC31.12.2003
PT20.01.2004
[2008/16]
Former [2006/14]AT20.08.2003
BE20.08.2003
CH20.08.2003
FI20.08.2003
FR20.08.2003
LI20.08.2003
NL20.08.2003
DK20.11.2003
GR20.11.2003
SE20.11.2003
DE21.11.2003
ES01.12.2003
CY31.12.2003
GB31.12.2003
IE31.12.2003
LU31.12.2003
MC31.12.2003
PT20.01.2004
Former [2005/23]AT20.08.2003
BE20.08.2003
CH20.08.2003
FI20.08.2003
LI20.08.2003
NL20.08.2003
DK20.11.2003
GR20.11.2003
SE20.11.2003
DE21.11.2003
ES01.12.2003
CY31.12.2003
GB31.12.2003
IE31.12.2003
LU31.12.2003
MC31.12.2003
PT20.01.2004
Former [2005/03]AT20.08.2003
BE20.08.2003
CH20.08.2003
FI20.08.2003
LI20.08.2003
NL20.08.2003
DK20.11.2003
GR20.11.2003
SE20.11.2003
DE21.11.2003
ES01.12.2003
CY31.12.2003
GB31.12.2003
IE31.12.2003
MC31.12.2003
PT20.01.2004
Former [2005/02]AT20.08.2003
BE20.08.2003
CH20.08.2003
FI20.08.2003
LI20.08.2003
NL20.08.2003
DK20.11.2003
GR20.11.2003
SE20.11.2003
DE21.11.2003
ES01.12.2003
CY31.12.2003
GB31.12.2003
MC31.12.2003
PT20.01.2004
Former [2005/01]AT20.08.2003
BE20.08.2003
CH20.08.2003
FI20.08.2003
LI20.08.2003
NL20.08.2003
DK20.11.2003
GR20.11.2003
SE20.11.2003
DE21.11.2003
ES01.12.2003
CY31.12.2003
GB31.12.2003
PT20.01.2004
Former [2004/46]AT20.08.2003
BE20.08.2003
CH20.08.2003
FI20.08.2003
LI20.08.2003
NL20.08.2003
DK20.11.2003
GR20.11.2003
SE20.11.2003
DE21.11.2003
ES01.12.2003
CY31.12.2003
PT20.01.2004
Former [2004/36]AT20.08.2003
BE20.08.2003
CH20.08.2003
FI20.08.2003
LI20.08.2003
NL20.08.2003
DK20.11.2003
GR20.11.2003
SE20.11.2003
DE21.11.2003
CY31.12.2003
PT20.01.2004
Former [2004/31]AT20.08.2003
BE20.08.2003
CH20.08.2003
FI20.08.2003
LI20.08.2003
NL20.08.2003
DK20.11.2003
GR20.11.2003
SE20.11.2003
DE21.11.2003
PT20.01.2004
Former [2004/29]AT20.08.2003
BE20.08.2003
CH20.08.2003
FI20.08.2003
LI20.08.2003
NL20.08.2003
DK20.11.2003
GR20.11.2003
SE20.11.2003
Former [2004/28]AT20.08.2003
BE20.08.2003
CH20.08.2003
FI20.08.2003
LI20.08.2003
NL20.08.2003
GR20.11.2003
SE20.11.2003
Former [2004/22]AT20.08.2003
CH20.08.2003
FI20.08.2003
LI20.08.2003
NL20.08.2003
GR20.11.2003
SE20.11.2003
Former [2004/16]AT20.08.2003
FI20.08.2003
NL20.08.2003
GR20.11.2003
SE20.11.2003
Former [2004/14]AT20.08.2003
FI20.08.2003
NL20.08.2003
GR20.11.2003
Former [2004/13]FI20.08.2003
NL20.08.2003
Former [2004/12]FI20.08.2003
Cited inInternational search[A]FR2365316  (STOLL CHRISTOF GMBH CO KG [DE]) [A] 1 * the whole document *
by applicantUS4372611