blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP1037682

EP1037682 - ANGIOGRAPHIC INJECTOR SYSTEM WITH MULTIPLE PROCESSOR REDUNDANCY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  21.07.2006
Database last updated on 18.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip30.03.2007Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): LU
published on 02.05.2007  [2007/18]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ACIST Medical Systems, Inc.
7450 Flying Cloud Drive, Suite 150
Eden Prairie, MN 55344 / US
[N/P]
Former [2005/48]For all designated states
ACIST Medical Systems, Inc.
7450 Flying Cloud Drive, Suite 150
Eden Prairie, MN 55344 / US
Former [2000/39]For all designated states
ACIST Medical Systems, Inc.
10250 Valley View Road, Suite 117
Eden Prairie, MN 55344 / US
Inventor(s)01 / DUCHON, Doug, J.
9630 Foxford Road
Chanhassen, MN 55317 / US
02 / SMITH, James, P.
916 Duthmans Way
Watertown, MN 55388 / US
03 / ANDERSON, Katherine, H.
1230 Wills Place
Golden Valley, MN 55422 / US
04 / WILSON, Robert, F.
7373 Amber Drive
Shorview, MN 55126 / US
05 / LUI, Jiyan
2758 Dale Street North
Roseville, MN 55113 / US
[2000/39]
Representative(s)Baker, Colin John
Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre
Talbot Street
Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/39]Baker, Colin John
Eric Potter Clarkson Park View House 58 The Ropewalk
Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB
Application number, filing date98960163.805.11.1998
[2000/39]
WO1998US23736
Priority number, dateUS1997096608807.11.1997         Original published format: US 966088
[2000/39]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report
No.:WO9924095
Date:20.05.1999
Language:EN
[1999/20]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1037682
Date:27.09.2000
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.05.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2000/39]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1037682
Date:14.09.2005
Language:EN
[2005/37]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP19.08.1999
ClassificationIPC:A61M5/172
[2000/39]
CPC:
A61B6/504 (EP,US); A61B6/481 (EP,US); A61M5/14216 (EP,US);
A61M5/14546 (EP,US); A61M5/16827 (EP,US); A61M5/172 (EP,US);
A61B6/548 (EP,US); A61M2205/3561 (EP,US); A61M2209/01 (EP,US);
A61M2230/04 (EP,US); A61M5/001 (EP,US); A61M5/1723 (EP,US);
Y10S128/01 (EP,US); Y10S128/12 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/39]
TitleGerman:ANGIOGRAPHIE-SPRITZE MIT MEHRFACHREDUNDANTEN PROZESSOREN[2000/39]
English:ANGIOGRAPHIC INJECTOR SYSTEM WITH MULTIPLE PROCESSOR REDUNDANCY[2000/39]
French:SYSTEME D'INJECTION POUR ANGIOGRAPHIE AVEC REDONDANCE DE PLUSIEURS PROCESSEURS[2000/39]
Entry into regional phase07.06.2000National basic fee paid 
07.06.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
07.06.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.05.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
07.06.2000Examination requested  [2000/39]
22.11.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M07)
25.06.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.11.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
07.05.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.06.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
09.08.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.11.2004Communication of intention to grant the patent
26.05.2005Fee for grant paid
26.05.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP05076973.6  / EP1607112
EP05076974.4  / EP1611911
Opposition(s)15.06.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/34]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.11.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
22.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
13.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
12.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
23.12.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.11.200407   M06   Fee paid on   23.12.2004
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipBE14.09.2005
FI14.09.2005
NL14.09.2005
IE07.11.2005
LU30.11.2005
DK14.12.2005
GR14.12.2005
SE14.12.2005
PT14.02.2006
[2007/18]
Former [2006/49]BE14.09.2005
FI14.09.2005
NL14.09.2005
IE07.11.2005
DK14.12.2005
GR14.12.2005
SE14.12.2005
PT14.02.2006
Former [2006/35]BE14.09.2005
FI14.09.2005
NL14.09.2005
DK14.12.2005
GR14.12.2005
SE14.12.2005
PT14.02.2006
Former [2006/25]BE14.09.2005
FI14.09.2005
NL14.09.2005
GR14.12.2005
SE14.12.2005
PT14.02.2006
Former [2006/22]FI14.09.2005
NL14.09.2005
GR14.12.2005
SE14.12.2005
Former [2006/15]FI14.09.2005
GR14.12.2005
SE14.12.2005
Former [2006/13]FI14.09.2005
SE14.12.2005
Cited inInternational search[X]US4624661  (ARIMOND TIMOTHY V [US]) [X] 7-16,22 * column W *;
 [X]US4908017  (HOWSON DAVID C [US], et al) [X] 7-10,14,15,17-24* column W *;
 [X]EP0384155  (BRAUN MELSUNGEN AG [DE]) [X] 7-27 * figure 1; claim 1 *;
 [X]WO9620745  (ABBOTT LAB [US]) [X] 7-16,22 * page 4, line 4 - page 7, line 19; figure 1 *;
 [AD]WO9632887  (INVASATEC INC [US])
by applicantUS4812724
 US4854324
 US19970079023
 US19950426149
 US19970957801
 US19970957228
 US19970965583
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.