Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1044280

EP1044280 - SELECTIVE KILLING AND DIAGNOSIS OF p53?+ NEOPLASTIC CELLS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  15.04.2005
Database last updated on 17.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip15.04.2005Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 01.06.2005  [2005/22]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ONYX PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Building A, 3031 Research Drive
Richmond, CA 94806 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/42]For all designated states
ONYX PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.
Building A, 3031 Research Drive
Richmond, CA 94806 / US
Inventor(s)01 / SAMPSON-JOHANNES, Adam
1080 1/2 Grizzly Peak
Berkeley, CA 94708 / US
02 / KIRN, David
359 Starling Road
Mill Valley, CA 94941 / US
[2000/42]
Representative(s)Cripps, Joanna Elizabeth , et al
Mewburn Ellis LLP
City Tower
40 Basinghall Street
London EC2V 5DE / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/42]Cripps, Joanna Elizabeth , et al
Mewburn Ellis York House 23 Kingsway
GB-London WC2B 6HP / GB
Application number, filing date98960182.811.11.1998
[2000/42]
WO1998US24089
Priority number, dateUS19970069357P12.12.1997         Original published format: US 69357 P
[2000/42]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9931261
Date:24.06.1999
Language:EN
[1999/25]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1044280
Date:18.10.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.06.1999
[2000/42]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP24.06.1999
ClassificationInternational:C12N15/86, A61K48/00, A61K35/76, G01N33/50, C12Q1/68
[2000/42]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/42]
TitleGerman:SELEKTIVE ABTÖTUNG UND DIAGNOSE VON P53+ NEOPLASTISCHEN ZELLEN[2000/42]
English:SELECTIVE KILLING AND DIAGNOSIS OF p53?+ NEOPLASTIC CELLS[2000/42]
French:DESTRUCTION SELECTIVE ET DIAGNOSTIC DE CELLULES NEOPLASIQUES A P53?+[2000/42]
Entry into regional phase29.05.2000National basic fee paid 
29.05.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
29.05.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure11.06.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
29.05.2000Examination requested  [2000/42]
17.09.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.01.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.07.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.11.2004Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2005/22]
30.12.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2005/22]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.10.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
22.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
25.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
21.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.11.200407   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[AD]US5677178  (MCCORMICK FRANCIS [US]) [AD] 1-12 *see in particular claims 1-5,7-9,13;col. 16, l.19- col.18.l.35 *
 [XA]  - KIM, Y. T. ET AL, "Preferential replication of a E1B-attenuated adenovirus in drug-resistant ovarian tumour lines with defective mismatch repair and loss of p53 function.", BRITISH JOURNAL OF CANCER; JOINT WINTER MEETING OF THE BRITISH ASSOCIATION OF CANCER RESEARCH, THE ASSOCIATION OF CANCER PHYSICIANS AND THE ROYAL SOCIETY OF MEDICINE LONDON, ENGLAND, UK NOVEMBER 27-28, 1997, (1998), vol. 78, no. 2, page 150, XP002095382 [X] 1-5,8 * see the abstract * [A] 9-12
 [XD]  - HEISE ET AL., "ONYX-015, an E+B gene-attenuated adenovirus, causes tumor-specific cytolysis and antitumoral efficacy that can be augmented by standard chemotherapeutic agents", NATURE MEDICINE, (199706), vol. 3, no. 6, pages 639 - 645, XP002095383 [XD] 1-6,8 * see in particular Tables 1&2 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nm0697-639
 [X]  - HEISE ET AL., "Antitumor efficacy following intravenous administration of a replication competent, attenuated adenovirus in nude mice", PROC ANNU MEET AM ASSOC CANCER RES, (199703), vol. 38, page A66, XP002095384 [X] 1-6,8 * see the abstract *