Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1048081

EP1048081 - BANDGAP ISOLATED LIGHT EMITTER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  27.02.2004
Database last updated on 17.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip15.08.2008Change - applicantpublished on 17.09.2008  [2008/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
HONEYWELL INC.
Honeywell Plaza
Minneapolis, MN 55408 / US
[N/P]
Former [2008/38]For all designated states
HONEYWELL INC.
Honeywell Plaza
Minneapolis MN 55408 / US
Former [2000/44]For all designated states
Honeywell Inc.
Honeywell Plaza MN12-8251 P.O. Box 524
Minneapolis Minnesota 55440-0524 / US
Inventor(s)01 / JOHNSON, Ralph, H.
211 Ridgeview
Murphy, TX 75094 / US
[2000/44]
Representative(s)Fox-Male, Nicholas Vincent Humbert , et al
Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre
Talbot Street
Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB
[N/P]
Former [2008/33]Fox-Male, Nicholas Vincent Humbert , et al
Potter Clarkson LLP Park View House 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham
NG1 5DD / GB
Former [2001/42]Fox-Male, Nicholas Vincent Humbert , et al
Eric Potter Clarkson Park View House 58 The Ropewalk
Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB
Former [2000/44]Sturm, Christoph
Honeywell AG, Kaiserleistrasse 39
63067 Offenbach am Main / DE
Application number, filing date98960291.720.11.1998
[2000/44]
WO1998US24702
Priority number, dateUS1997098973412.12.1997         Original published format: US 989734
[2000/44]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9931735
Date:24.06.1999
Language:EN
[1999/25]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1048081
Date:02.11.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.06.1999
[2000/44]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1048081
Date:23.04.2003
Language:EN
[2003/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP24.06.1999
ClassificationInternational:H01L29/861, H01L33/00, H01S5/183
[2002/34]
Former International [2000/44]H01L29/861, H01L33/00, H01S3/085
Designated contracting statesBE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [2000/44]
TitleGerman:BANDLÜCKENISOLIERTE LICHTEMITTIERENDE VORRICHTUNG[2000/44]
English:BANDGAP ISOLATED LIGHT EMITTER[2000/44]
French:EMETTEUR DE LUMIERE ISOLE PAR L'INTERBANDE[2000/44]
Entry into regional phase12.07.2000National basic fee paid 
12.07.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
12.07.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.06.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
12.07.2000Examination requested  [2000/44]
15.03.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
25.09.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
01.08.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
31.01.2003Fee for grant paid
31.01.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP02080608.9  / EP1315216
Opposition(s)26.01.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/16]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.11.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
07.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
07.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[XY]FR2440616  (BOULEY JEAN CLAUDE) [X] 1,22 * page 3, column 22 - page 5, column 20; figures 3,4 * [Y] 1,2,25,32;
 [XY]JPS6170784  ;
 [XY]JPH02114676  ;
 [XY]JPH02114675  ;
 [Y]JPS60152087  ;
 [Y]JPS6286883  ;
 [Y]JPH0555702  ;
 [A]US4980893  (THORNTON ROBERT L [US], et al) [A] 1,18 * column 4, line 15 - column 6, line 53; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]EP0562768  (AMERICAN TELEPHONE & TELEGRAPH [US]) [A] 1,22,25,32 * column 5, line 1 - column 5, line 31; figure 2 *
 [XY]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19860819), vol. 010, no. 240, Database accession no. (E - 429), [X] 1,22 * abstract * [Y] 1,2,25,32
 [XY]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900720), vol. 014, no. 338, Database accession no. (E - 0954), [X] 1,22 * abstract * [Y] 1,2,25,32
 [Y]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19851213), vol. 009, no. 318, Database accession no. (E - 366), [Y] 1,25 * abstract *
 [Y]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19870917), vol. 011, no. 288, Database accession no. (E - 542), [Y] 1,2,32 * abstract *
 [Y]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19930706), vol. 017, no. 356, Database accession no. (E - 1394), [Y] 32 * abstract *