Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0975741

EP0975741 - ALPHA/BETA HYDROLASE-FOLD ENZYMES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  11.07.2008
Database last updated on 18.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip11.07.2008Refusal of applicationpublished on 13.08.2008  [2008/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
GENENCOR INTERNATIONAL, INC.
925 Page Mill Road
Palo Alto, California 94304 / US
[2001/42]
Former [2000/05]For all designated states
GENENCOR INTERNATIONAL INC.
4 Cambridge Place, 1870 Winton Road South
Rochester, New York 14618 / US
Inventor(s)01 / ESTELL, David, A.
248 Woodbridge Circle
San Mateo, CA 94403 / US
[2000/05]
Representative(s)Brasnett, Adrian Hugh , et al
Mewburn Ellis LLP
City Tower
40 Basinghall Street
London EC2V 5DE / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/05]Brasnett, Adrian Hugh , et al
Mewburn Ellis York House 23 Kingsway
London WC2B 6HP / GB
Application number, filing date98960384.019.11.1998
[2000/05]
WO1998US24973
Priority number, dateGB1997002462920.11.1997         Original published format: GB 9724629
[2000/05]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO9927081
Date:03.06.1999
Language:EN
[1999/22]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0975741
Date:02.02.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.06.1999
[2000/05]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP09.12.1999
ClassificationInternational:C12N9/14, C12N15/55, C12N1/20, C12R1/07, C11D3/386, A23K1/16, D06M16/00, C12Q1/68
[2000/05]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/05]
TitleGerman:ALPHA/BETA HYDROLASE-FALT ENTHALTENDE ENZYME[2000/05]
English:ALPHA/BETA HYDROLASE-FOLD ENZYMES[2000/05]
French:ENZYMES PLIS D'HYDROLASE ALPHA/BETA[2000/05]
Entry into regional phase20.07.1999National basic fee paid 
20.07.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
20.07.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure20.07.1999Examination requested  [2000/05]
10.09.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.01.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.09.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.01.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.01.2007Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 29.03.2007
26.01.2007Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
29.03.2007Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
14.03.2008Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2008/33]
24.03.2008Application refused, date of legal effect [2008/33]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.11.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
14.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
13.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
12.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
12.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
14.11.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
14.11.2006Renewal fee patent year 09
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.11.200710   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[A]EP0369817  (BIOTEKNIKA INTERNATIONAL [US]) [A] 1-5,11-14 * page 1, line 1 - page 2, line 27 * * page 3, line 1 - line 17 * * page 18, line 25 - line 35 *;
 EP0540074  [ ] (ENIRICERCHE SPA [IT]);
 [A]WO9516360  (FINNFEEDS INT LTD [GB], et al) [A] 5 * abstract *;
 [A]WO9606909  (DEGUSSA [DE], et al) [A] 7 * abstract *;
 [A]DE4433676  (COGNIS BIO UMWELT [DE]) [A] 9 * abstract *;
 [E]WO9903984  (GENENCOR INT [US], et al) [E] 1-14 * abstract * * page 2, line 1 - page 3, line 18 * * page 14, line 14 - page 15, line 24 *
 [A]  - CARRERA ET AL., "Bacillus subtilis srfA operon ORF4 prod.", EMBL SEQUENCE DATABASE, HEIDELBERG DE, (19930817), XP002108983 [A] 1 * the whole document *
 [A]  - LEVINE A ET AL, "A 10.3 kbp segment from nprB to argJ at the 102 region of the Bacillus subtilis chromosome", MICROBIOLOGY, (19970101), vol. 143, ISSN 1350-0872, pages 175 - 177, XP002080812 [A] 1 * abstract *
    [] - LEVINE ET AL., "YITV", EMBL SEQUENCE DATABASE, HEIDELBERG DE, (19970201), XP002080814 [ ] * the whole document *
 [DA]  - OLLIS D L ET AL, "THE ALPHA/BETA HYDROLASE FOLD", PROTEIN ENGINEERING, (19920101), vol. 5, no. 3, ISSN 0269-2139, pages 197 - 211, XP002057138
 [PX]  - KUNST ET AL., "YUXL protein", EMBL SEQUENCE DATABASE, HEIDELBERG DE, (19980101), XP002080815 [PX] 1-3 * the whole document *
    [] - KUNST ET AL., "The complete genome sequence of the gram-positive bacterium Bacillus subtilis", NATURE, (19971120), vol. 390, pages 49 - 256, XP002080813

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/36786