Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1030598

EP1030598 - SURGICAL TEMPLATE ASSEMBLY AND METHOD FOR DRILLING AND INSTALLINGDENTAL IMPLANTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  01.05.2009
Database last updated on 13.07.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip01.05.2009Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 03.06.2009  [2009/23]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Klein, Michael
76 Spruce Street
Cedarhurst, NY 11516 / US
For all designated states
Abrams, Michael E.
6 Diana Circle
Roslyn, NY 11576 / US
For all designated states
Manno, Richard J.
6 Scott Court
Fort Salonga, NY 11768 / US
[2000/35]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[2000/35]
Representative(s)Mackenzie, Andrew Bryan , et al
Scott & York
Intellectual Property Limited
45 Grosvenor Road
St. Albans Hertfordshire AL1 3AW / GB
[N/P]
Former [2007/02]Mackenzie, Andrew Bryan , et al
Scott & York Intellectual Property Limited 45 Grosvenor Road
St. Albans, Hertfordshire AL1 3AW / GB
Former [2006/50]Maury, Richard Philip , et al
Scott & York Intellectual Property Limited 45 Grosvenor Road
St. Albans, Hertfordshire AL1 3AW / GB
Former [2000/35]Maury, Richard Philip , et al
Sommerville & Rushton, 45 Grosvenor Road
St. Albans, Herts AL1 3AW / GB
Application number, filing date98960513.423.11.1998
[2000/35]
WO1998US25303
Priority number, dateUS1997097732424.11.1997         Original published format: US 977324
[2000/35]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9926540
Date:03.06.1999
Language:EN
[1999/22]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1030598
Date:30.08.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.06.1999
[2000/35]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US03.06.1999
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.05.2003
ClassificationInternational:A61B6/14, A61C8/00, A61C1/08
[2003/25]
Former International [2000/35]A61B6/14, A61C8/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/35]
TitleGerman:CHIRURGISCHE SCHABLONE UND VERFAHREN ZUM BOHREN UND EINSETZEN DENTALER IMPLANTATE[2000/35]
English:SURGICAL TEMPLATE ASSEMBLY AND METHOD FOR DRILLING AND INSTALLINGDENTAL IMPLANTS[2000/35]
French:ENSEMBLE GABARIT CHIRURGICAL ET PROCEDE DE FORAGE ET D'INSTALLATION D'IMPLANTS DENTAIRES[2000/35]
Entry into regional phase23.06.2000National basic fee paid 
23.06.2000Search fee paid 
23.06.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
23.06.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.06.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
23.06.2000Examination requested  [2000/35]
10.03.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
20.09.2006Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.11.2006Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
02.05.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.05.2007Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.09.2007Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.08.2008Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.12.2008Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2009/23]
21.01.2009Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2009/23]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.11.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
28.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
27.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
26.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
12.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
24.11.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
28.11.2006Renewal fee patent year 09
12.12.2007Renewal fee patent year 10
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.11.200710   M06   Fee paid on   12.12.2007
30.11.200811   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[Y]US5636986  (PEZESHKIAN ALEX A [US]) [Y] 20,24-26,28,29 * the whole document *;
 [Y]WO9426199  (UNIV JOSEPH FOURIER [FR], et al) [Y] 20,24-26,28,29 * the whole document *
International search[X]WO9426199  (UNIV JOSEPH FOURIER [FR], et al);
 [YP]US5725376  (POIRIER MICHEL [CA])
by applicantUS5320529