EP1036315 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR SIMULTANEOUS MEASUREMENT OF MASS AND HEAT FLOW CHANGES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.08.2009 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.08.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.09.2009 [2009/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Smith, Allan L. 328 Pembroke Road Bala Cynwyd, PA 19004 / US | For all designated states Wadso, Ingemar Blackhornsvagen 6 224 67 Lund / SE | [2000/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2000/38] | Representative(s) | Jorio, Paolo, et al Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2008/45] | Jorio, Paolo, et al STUDIO TORTA Via Viotti 9 10121 Torino / IT | ||
Former [2000/38] | Jorio, Paolo, et al STUDIO TORTA S.r.l., Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 98960679.3 | 02.12.1998 | [2000/38] | WO1998US25637 | Priority number, date | US19970067239P | 02.12.1997 Original published format: US 67239 P | [2000/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9928735 | Date: | 10.06.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1036315 | Date: | 20.09.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.06.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 10.06.1999 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.12.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G01N27/00, G01N11/00, G01K17/00 | [2001/06] | CPC: |
G01G3/13 (EP,US);
G01N27/00 (KR);
G01K17/20 (EP,US);
G01N25/4813 (EP,US);
G01N25/4866 (EP,US);
G01N5/02 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2000/38] | G01N27/00, G01N11/00 | Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [2000/38] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR GLEICHZEITGEN MESSUNG VON MASSE-UND WÄRMEVERÄNDER-UNGEN | [2000/38] | English: | APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR SIMULTANEOUS MEASUREMENT OF MASS AND HEAT FLOW CHANGES | [2000/38] | French: | APPAREIL ET PROCEDE DE MESURE EN SIMULTANE DES CHANGEMENTS DE DEBIT MASSIQUE ET DE FLUX THERMIQUE | [2000/38] | Entry into regional phase | 29.06.2000 | National basic fee paid | 29.06.2000 | Search fee paid | 29.06.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.06.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.07.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 30.06.2000 | Examination requested [2000/38] | 24.08.2000 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.03.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.11.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.04.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/40] | 13.05.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.12.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.12.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 18.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 17.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2002 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   14.02.2003 | 31.12.2008 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - AUGE J ET AL, "USING QUARTZ-CRYSTAL-MICROBALANCE-PRINCIPLE FOR THE DETECTION AND PURITY CONTROL OF HYDROCARBONS IN GASES AND AS LIQUIDS", EXPERIMENTAL TECHNIQUE OF PHYSICS,DE,HELDERMANN VERLAG, BERLIN, (1994), vol. 40, no. 1, ISSN 0014-4924, pages 27 - 34, XP000195586 [A] 1,15,22,24,26,38,41,45,56,61,64,69,73 * the whole document * | [A] - LERCHNER J ET AL, "CALORIMETRIC DETECTION OF ORGANIC VAPOURS USING INCLUSION REACTIONSWITH ORGANIC COATING MATERIALS", SENSORS AND ACTUATORS B,CH,ELSEVIER SEQUOIA S.A., LAUSANNE, (19960401), vol. B32, no. 1, ISSN 0925-4005, pages 71 - 75, XP000636385 [A] 1,15,22,24,26,38,41,45,56,61,64,69,73 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0925-4005(96)80111-0 | [A] - WEIMAR U ET AL, "Gravimetric, dielectric and calorimetric methods for the detection of organic solvent vapours using poly(ether urethane) coatings", SENSORS AND ACTUATORS B,CH,ELSEVIER SEQUOIA S.A., LAUSANNE, (19960801), vol. 34, no. 1-3, ISSN 0925-4005, pages 356 - 360, XP004078005 [A] 1,15,22,24,26,38,41,45,56,61,64,69,73 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0925-4005(96)01912-0 | [A] - POLYAKOVA I G ET AL, "Heats of adsorption of water on layered silicates and silica gel", INSPEC, INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL ENGINEERS, STEVENAGE, GB, Database accession no. 1773864, XP000974463 [A] 1,15,22,24,26,38,41,45,56,61,64,69,73 * abstract * | [ ] - KOLLOIDNYI ZHURNAL, JULY-AUG. 1980, USSR, vol. 42, no. 4, ISSN 0023-2912, pages 774 - 778 | International search | [A]US5201215 (GRANSTAFF VICTORIA E [US], et al); | [A]US4561286 (SEKLER JOERG [CH], et al); | [A]US4788466 (PAUL DAVID W [US], et al); | [A]US4872765 (SCHODOWSKI STANLEY S [US]) |