Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1035991

EP1035991 - ACETYLENE-BASED AIRBAG INFLATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  20.01.2006
Database last updated on 20.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip20.01.2006Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 08.03.2006  [2006/10]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Autoliv ASP, Inc.
3350 Airport Road Ogden
Utah 84405-1563 / US
[N/P]
Former [2000/38]For all designated states
Autoliv ASP, Inc.
3350 Airport Road
Ogden, Utah 84405-1563 / US
Inventor(s)01 / RINK, Karl, K.
3711 East 4350 North
Liberty, UT 84310 / US
02 / GREEN, David, J.
632 West 300 North
Brigham City, UT 84302 / US
03 / HEPWORTH, Michael
3553 North 350 East
North Ogden, UT 84414 / US
[2000/38]
Representative(s)Bankes, Stephen Charles Digby , et al
Baron Warren Redfern
1000 Great West Road
Brentford TW8 9DW / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/38]Bankes, Stephen Charles Digby , et al
BARON & WARREN 18 South End Kensington
London W8 5BU / GB
Application number, filing date98960682.702.12.1998
[2000/38]
WO1998US25640
Priority number, dateUS1997098288402.12.1997         Original published format: US 982884
[2000/38]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9928166
Date:10.06.1999
Language:EN
[1999/23]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1035991
Date:20.09.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.06.1999
[2000/38]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US10.06.1999
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.09.2002
ClassificationInternational:B60R21/26, C06D5/00
[2002/43]
Former International [2000/38]B60R21/26
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [2000/38]
TitleGerman:LUFTSACK-AUFBLASVORRICHTUNG AUF ACETYLENBASIS[2000/38]
English:ACETYLENE-BASED AIRBAG INFLATOR[2000/38]
French:DISPOSITIF DE GONFLAGE D'UN AIBAG A BASE D'ACETHYLENE[2000/38]
Entry into regional phase02.06.2000National basic fee paid 
02.06.2000Search fee paid 
02.06.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
02.06.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure01.07.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
07.06.2000Examination requested  [2000/38]
25.05.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
01.10.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.03.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.07.2005Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2006/10]
13.09.2005Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2006/10]
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.12.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
14.12.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
31.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
29.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
23.12.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[DA]US5470104  (SMITH BRADLEY W [US], et al) [DA] 1,13 * figure -; claim - *;
 [DA]US5669629  (RINK KARL K [US]) [DA] 1,13 * claim - *;
 [A]US3664134  (SEITZ JOSEPH R M) [A] 1,13 * figure - *;
 [A]US4310334  (WALDRON ROBERT D) [A] 1,13 * claim - *
International search[A]US5806885  (HOCK CHRISTOPHER [US]);
 [A]US651132  (DAVIS GEORGE H [US]);
 [A]US1056560  (LIPPINCOTT FISHER H [US])