Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1040584

EP1040584 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR CONTROLLING DELIVERY OF UNSOLICITED ELECTRONIC MAIL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  29.09.2006
Database last updated on 17.11.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip03.08.2018Change - lapse in a contracting state
State(s) deleted from list of lapses: ES
published on 05.09.2018  [2018/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bright Mail Inc.
Suite 300, 651 Brannan Street
San Francisco, CA 94107 / US
[2005/47]
Former [2000/40]For all designated states
Bright Light Technologies Inc.
Suite 300, 651 Brannan Street
San Francisco, CA 94107 / US
Inventor(s)01 / PAUL, Sunil
1506 Willard Street
San Francisco, CA 94117 / US
[2000/40]
Representative(s)Sturt, Clifford Mark , et al
Miller Sturt Kenyon
9 John Street
London
WC1N 2ES / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/40]Sturt, Clifford Mark , et al
Miller Sturt Kenyon 9 John Street
London WC1N 2ES / GB
Application number, filing date98960804.708.12.1998
[2000/40]
WO1998US25961
Priority number, dateUS1997099769223.12.1997         Original published format: US 997692
[2000/40]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO9933188
Date:01.07.1999
Language:EN
[1999/26]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1040584
Date:04.10.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.07.1999
[2000/40]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1040584
Date:23.11.2005
Language:EN
[2005/47]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP26.08.1999
ClassificationInternational:G06F17/60, H04L12/58
[2005/24]
Former International [2005/01]H04B1/00, G06F17/60, H04L12/58
Former International [2000/40]H04B1/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   CY,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/40]
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR KONTROLLE DER LIEFERUNG UNERBETENER ELEKTRONISCHER POST[2000/40]
English:APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR CONTROLLING DELIVERY OF UNSOLICITED ELECTRONIC MAIL[2000/40]
French:APPAREIL ET PROCEDE SERVANT A LIMITER LA REMISE DE COURRIER ELECTRONIQUE NON SOLLICITE[2000/40]
Entry into regional phase23.06.2000National basic fee paid 
23.06.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
23.06.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.07.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
23.06.2000Examination requested  [2000/40]
28.11.2000Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.03.2001Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.02.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.06.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.05.2005Communication of intention to grant the patent
29.08.2005Fee for grant paid
29.08.2005Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)24.08.2006No opposition filed within time limit [2006/44]
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.12.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
26.02.2002Renewal fee patent year 04
23.12.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
29.12.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
23.12.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.200104   M06   Fee paid on   26.02.2002
Lapses during opposition  TooltipBE23.11.2005
FI23.11.2005
CY08.12.2005
MC31.12.2005
LU23.01.2006
DK23.02.2006
GR23.02.2006
PT24.04.2006
[2018/36]
Former [2018/28]BE23.11.2005
ES23.11.2005
FI23.11.2005
CY08.12.2005
MC31.12.2005
LU23.01.2006
DK23.02.2006
GR23.02.2006
PT24.04.2006
Former [2007/21]BE23.11.2005
FI23.11.2005
CY08.12.2005
MC31.12.2005
LU23.01.2006
DK23.02.2006
GR23.02.2006
PT24.04.2006
Former [2007/18]BE23.11.2005
FI23.11.2005
MC31.12.2005
LU23.01.2006
DK23.02.2006
GR23.02.2006
PT24.04.2006
Former [2006/49]BE23.11.2005
FI23.11.2005
MC31.12.2005
DK23.02.2006
GR23.02.2006
PT24.04.2006
Former [2006/40]BE23.11.2005
FI23.11.2005
MC31.12.2005
DK23.02.2006
GR23.02.2006
Former [2006/38]BE23.11.2005
FI23.11.2005
DK23.02.2006
GR23.02.2006
Former [2006/36]BE23.11.2005
FI23.11.2005
DK23.02.2006
Former [2006/35]FI23.11.2005
DK23.02.2006
Former [2006/24]FI23.11.2005
Cited inInternational search[X]  - RANUM M J ET AL, "Implementing a generalized tool for network monitoring", PROCEEDINGS OF THE ELEVENTH SYSTEMS ADMINISTRATION CONFERENCE (LISA XI), PROCEEDINGS OF THE ELEVENTH SYSTEMS ADMINISTRATION CONFERENCE (LISA XI), SAN DIEGO, CA, USA, 26-31 OCT. 1997, ISBN 1-880446-90-1, 1997, Berkeley, CA, USA, USENIX Assoc, USA, pages 1 - 8, XP002107361 [X] 1-7 * page 2, column 1, paragraph 3 - page 3, column 2, paragraph 2 * * page 5, column 1, paragraph 2 - page 7, column 2, paragraph 3 *
 [PA]  - CRANOR L F ET AL, "SPAM", COMMUNICATIONS OF THE ASSOCIATION FOR COMPUTING MACHINERY, (19980801), vol. 41, no. 8, pages 74 - 83, XP000789467 [PA] 1-7 * page 78, column 1, paragraph 3 - page 80, column 2, paragraph 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/280324.280336
 [A]  - LEFEBVRE W, "Sendmail and spam", UNIX REVIEW'S PERFORMANCE COMPUTING, AUG. 1998, MILLER FREEMAN, USA, ISSN 0742-3136, vol. 16, no. 9, pages 55 - 58, XP002107362 [A] 1-7 * the whole document *