blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP0968563


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
06.02.2004 No opposition filed within time limit published on  24.03.2004  [2004/13]
15.02.2003 (Expected) grant published on  02.04.2003  [2003/14]
01.02.2003 Communication of intention to grant a patent
11.11.2002 Renewal fee
06.09.2002 Communication of intention to grant a patent
12.11.2001 Renewal fee
09.11.2000 Renewal fee
21.01.2000 Request for examination filed published on  08.03.2000 [2000/10]
19.11.1999 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  05.01.2000 [2000/01]
04.10.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
09.08.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
21.07.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
10.07.1999 PCT data prior to European publication
26.01.1999 PCT data prior to European publication