blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP0968563
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP3904613BGlobal Dossier 11.04.2007B2
JP2001513320 28.08.2001A
Priority number Date
DE9802987 09.10.1998
DE19817304 18.04.1998
DE19757742 23.12.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP0968563Global Dossier 02.04.2003B1
EP0968563 05.01.2000A1
Priority number Date
DE9802987 09.10.1998
DE19817304 18.04.1998
DE19757742 23.12.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU731628B 05.04.2001B2
AU1659999 19.07.1999A
Priority number Date
DE9802987 09.10.1998
DE19817304 18.04.1998
DE19757742 23.12.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
BR9807599 21.09.2010B1
BR9807599 22.02.2000A
Priority number Date
DE9802987 09.10.1998
DE19817304 18.04.1998
DE19757742 23.12.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
DE59807741D 08.05.2003D1
Priority number Date
DE59807741 09.10.1998
DE19817304 18.04.1998
DE9802987 09.10.1998
DE19757742 23.12.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
KR100563393B 23.03.2006B1
KR20000075535 15.12.2000A
Priority number Date
DE9802987 09.10.1998
DE19817304 18.04.1998
DE19757742 23.12.1997
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US6223784 01.05.2001B1
Priority number Date
DE9802987 09.10.1998
DE19817304 18.04.1998
DE19757742 23.12.1997
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO9934499Global Dossier 08.07.1999A1
Priority number Date
DE19817304 18.04.1998
DE19757742 23.12.1997
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
CZ300076 21.01.2009B6
CZ9902919 11.10.2000A3
Priority number Date
DE19817304 18.04.1998
DE19757742 23.12.1997
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
DE19817304 08.04.2010B4
DE19817304 24.06.1999A1
Priority number Date
DE19817304 18.04.1998
DE19757742 23.12.1997
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
ES2196631T 16.12.2003T3
Priority number Date
DE19817304 18.04.1998
DE19757742 23.12.1997