blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Legal status: EP0968563

Designated contracting states DE 
 ES 
 FR 
 GB 
 IT 
 SE 
Examination procedure20.01.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Entry into regional phase23.09.1999National basic fee paid 
23.09.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
10.01.2000Examination fee paid 
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.10.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
31.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
31.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
European patent granted02.04.2003
Opposition procedure05.01.2004No opposition filed within time limit published on 24.03.2004 
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:05.01.2000 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A1
Designated State(s):DE ES FR GB IT SE
 
Event date:08.03.2000 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:20000110
 
Event date:02.04.2003 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Designated State(s):DE ES FR GB IT SE
 
Event date:02.04.2003 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB FG4D
Code Expl.:+EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED
Free Format Text:NOT ENGLISH
 
Event date:08.05.2003 
Event description:CORRESPONDS TO:
Ref Document Number:59807741
Country of Ref Document:DE
DATE OF REF DOCUMENT:20030508
Kind Code of Ref Document:P
 
Event date:24.06.2003 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG SE TRGR
Code Expl.:+TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT
 
Event date:16.07.2003 
Event description:GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)
 
Event date:14.11.2003 
Event description:FR: TRANSLATION FILED
 
Event date:16.12.2003 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG ES FG2A 2196631 T3
Code Expl.:+DEFINITIVE PROTECTION
 
Event date:24.03.2004 
Event description:NO OPPOSITION FILED
Effective DATE:20040105
 
Event date:28.02.2013 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Payment DATE:20121023
Year of Fee Payment:15
 
Event date:28.02.2013 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:SE
Payment DATE:20121024
Year of Fee Payment:15
 
Event date:28.02.2014 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IT
Payment DATE:20131029
Year of Fee Payment:16
 
Event date:03.06.2014 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG SE EUG
Code Expl.:-EP PATENT HAS LAPSED
 
Event date:25.06.2014 
Event description:GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE
Effective DATE:20131009
 
Event date:31.07.2014 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20131009
 
Event date:29.08.2014 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:SE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20131010
 
Event date:31.08.2015 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IT
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:20141009
 
Event date:26.10.2015 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR PLFP
Code Expl.:+FEE PAYMENT
Year of Fee Payment:18
 
Event date:25.10.2016 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR PLFP
Code Expl.:+FEE PAYMENT
Year of Fee Payment:19
 
Event date:23.10.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR PLFP
Code Expl.:+FEE PAYMENT
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:27.11.2017 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R081 59807741 DE
Code Expl.: CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE
Owner Name:SEG AUTOMOTIVE GERMANY GMBH, DE
Free Format Text:FORMER OWNER: ROBERT BOSCH GMBH, 70469 STUTTGART, DE
 
Event date:25.01.2018 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG ES PC2A
Code Expl.:+TRANSFER OF PATENT
Owner Name:SEG AUTOMOTIVE GERMANY GMBH
Effective DATE:20180119
 
Event date:31.01.2018 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FR
Payment DATE:20171023
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:31.01.2018 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Payment DATE:20171023
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:28.02.2018 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:ES
Payment DATE:20171103
Year of Fee Payment:20
 
Event date:20.04.2018 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR TP
Code Expl.: TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY
Owner Name:SEG AUTOMOTIVE GERMANY GMBH, DE
Effective DATE:20180315
 
Event date:09.10.2018 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG DE R071 59807741 DE
Code Expl.:-EXPIRY OF RIGHT