Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0968563

EP0968563 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR PRODUCING WAVE WINDINGS FOR ELECTRICAL MACHINES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  06.02.2004
Database last updated on 19.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip06.02.2004No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 24.03.2004  [2004/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ROBERT BOSCH GMBH
Postfach 30 02 20
70442 Stuttgart / DE
[2000/01]
Inventor(s)01 / KIRSCHNER, Roland
Steig 11
D-71299 Wimsheim / DE
[2000/01]
Application number, filing date98960998.709.10.1998
[2000/01]
WO1998DE02987
Priority number, dateDE199715774223.12.1997         Original published format: DE 19757742
DE199811730418.04.1998         Original published format: DE 19817304
[2000/01]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9934499
Date:08.07.1999
Language:DE
[1999/27]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0968563
Date:05.01.2000
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.07.1999
[2000/01]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0968563
Date:02.04.2003
Language:DE
[2003/14]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP08.07.1999
ClassificationInternational:H02K15/04
[2000/01]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   SE [2000/01]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM HERSTELLEN VON WELLENWICKLUNGEN FÜR ELEKTRISCHE MASCHINEN[2000/01]
English:METHOD AND DEVICE FOR PRODUCING WAVE WINDINGS FOR ELECTRICAL MACHINES[2000/01]
French:PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE PRODUCTION D'ENROULEMENTS ONDULES POUR MACHINES ELECTRIQUES[2000/01]
Entry into regional phase23.09.1999National basic fee paid 
23.09.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
10.01.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.01.2000Examination requested  [2000/10]
10.09.2002Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.01.2003Fee for grant paid
20.01.2003Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)05.01.2004No opposition filed within time limit [2004/13]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.10.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
31.10.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
31.10.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
Cited inInternational search[AP]WO9825444  (POLYTOOL S R L [IT]) [AP] 1-5 * page 5, line 24 - page 11, line 2; figures 1-12 *;
 [A]US4512376  (BARRERA GIORGIO [IT]) [A] 1-5 * column 2, line 56 - column 4, line 21; figures 1-6 *;
 [AP]JPH10164805  ;
 [AD]US4857787  (TAJI RYOICHI [JP], et al) [AD] 1-5 * column 2, line 40 - column 3, line 16; figures 1-6 *
 [AP]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980930), vol. 098, no. 011, [AP] 1-5 * abstract *