Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1021280

EP1021280 - INTERCHANGEABLE COUPLING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.08.2002
Database last updated on 08.12.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip16.08.2002No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 02.10.2002  [2002/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
KUKA Schweissanlagen GmbH
Blücherstrasse 144
86165 Augsburg / DE
[2000/30]
Inventor(s)01 / KIKUT, Botho
Novalisstrasse 10
D-86157 Augsburg / DE
[2000/30]
Representative(s)Ernicke, Hans-Dieter , et al
Patentanwälte Ernicke & Ernicke
Schwibbogenplatz 2b
86153 Augsburg / DE
[N/P]
Former [2000/30]Ernicke, Hans-Dieter, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Schwibbogenplatz 2b
86153 Augsburg / DE
Application number, filing date98961092.830.09.1998
[2000/30]
WO1998EP06201
Priority number, dateDE1997218726U10.10.1997         Original published format: DE 29718726 U
[2000/30]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9919121
Date:22.04.1999
Language:DE
[1999/16]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1021280
Date:26.07.2000
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.04.1999
[2000/30]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1021280
Date:10.10.2001
Language:DE
[2001/41]
Search report(s)International search reportEP22.04.1999
ClassificationInternational:B25J15/04, B23Q1/00
[2000/30]
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   SE [2000/30]
TitleGerman:WECHSELKUPPLUNG[2000/30]
English:INTERCHANGEABLE COUPLING[2000/30]
French:ACCOUPLEMENT INTERCHANGEABLE[2000/30]
Entry into regional phase11.02.2000National basic fee paid 
11.02.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
11.02.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.05.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
11.02.2000Examination requested  [2000/30]
16.05.2001Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
11.07.2001Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.08.2001Fee for grant paid
01.08.2001Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)11.07.2002No opposition filed within time limit [2002/40]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.09.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
28.07.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[A]EP0548404  (BL AUTOTEC LTD [JP]) [A] 1-11 * abstract *;
 [A]EP0282417  (RENAULT AUTOMATION [FR]) [A] 1-11 * abstract *;
 [A]EP0092967  (FANUC LTD [JP]) [A] 1-11 * abstract *;
 [DA]DE3347423  (KIRST RUDI) [DA] 1-11 * abstract *