Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1034213

EP1034213 - EXTRUSION PROCESS FOR ENHANCING THE MELT STRENGTH OF POLYPROPYLENE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  14.09.2007
Database last updated on 18.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip24.10.2008Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): GR
published on 26.11.2008  [2008/48]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Akzo Nobel N.V.
Velperweg 76
6824 BM Arnhem / NL
[2000/37]
Inventor(s)01 / HOGT, Andreas, Herman
Deurningerstraat 58
NL-7514 BJ Enschede / NL
02 / FISCHER, Bart
Bitterschoten 42
NL-3831 PC Leusden / NL
03 / SPIJKERMAN, Geesje, Klasina
Lijsterbeslaan 18
NL-7421 AS Deventer / NL
[2000/37]
Representative(s)Duxbury, Stephen , et al
Arnold & Siedsma
Bezuidenhoutseweg 57
2594 AC The Hague / NL
[N/P]
Former [2000/37]Duxbury, Stephen , et al
Arnold & Siedsma, Sweelinckplein 1
2517 GK Den Haag / NL
Application number, filing date98961182.704.11.1998
[2000/37]
WO1998EP07219
Priority number, dateEP1997020362821.11.1997         Original published format: EP 97203628
[2000/37]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9927007
Date:03.06.1999
Language:EN
[1999/22]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1034213
Date:13.09.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.06.1999
[2000/37]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1034213
Date:11.10.2006
Language:EN
[2006/41]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP03.06.1999
ClassificationInternational:C08K5/00, C08K5/14
[2000/37]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   DK,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IE,   IT,   LI,   NL,   PT,   SE [2000/37]
Extension statesRO04.05.2000
TitleGerman:EXTRUSIONSVERFAHREN ZUR VERBESSERUNG DER SCHMELZSTÄRKE VON POLYPROPYLEN[2000/37]
English:EXTRUSION PROCESS FOR ENHANCING THE MELT STRENGTH OF POLYPROPYLENE[2000/37]
French:PROCEDE D'EXTRUSION PERMETTANT D'AUGMENTER LA RESISTANCE A L'ETAT FONDU DU POLYPROPYLENE[2000/37]
Entry into regional phase04.05.2000National basic fee paid 
04.05.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
04.05.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.04.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
04.05.2000Examination requested  [2000/37]
25.11.2002Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
05.06.2003Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.06.2003Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
09.02.2004Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
19.04.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.06.2004Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
13.12.2004Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.05.2005Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
01.12.2005Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.05.2006Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.08.2006Fee for grant paid
22.08.2006Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)12.07.2007No opposition filed within time limit [2007/42]
Request for further processing for:19.04.2004Request for further processing filed
19.04.2004Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
30.04.2004Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.10.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
22.11.2001Renewal fee patent year 04
25.11.2002Renewal fee patent year 05
21.11.2003Renewal fee patent year 06
22.11.2004Renewal fee patent year 07
29.11.2005Renewal fee patent year 08
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCH11.10.2006
LI11.10.2006
IE06.11.2006
DK11.01.2007
GR12.01.2007
[2008/48]
Former [2008/16]CH11.10.2006
LI11.10.2006
IE06.11.2006
DK11.01.2007
Former [2007/30]CH11.10.2006
LI11.10.2006
Cited inInternational search[DY]DE4340194  (CHISSO CORP [JP]) [DY] 1-14 * page 7, line 25 - page 9, line 14 *;
 [Y]DE4321529  (DANUBIA PETROCHEM DEUTSCHLAND [DE]) [Y] 1-14 * page 2, line 46 - line 55 *;
 [T]WO9749759  (AKZO NOBEL NV [NL], et al) [T] 1-14 * page 3, line 11 - page 10, line 22 *