EP1047513 - PROCESS FOR SHAPING A WORK PIECE AND CORRESPONDING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2000/44] | PROCESS FOR SHAPING A WORK PIECE | ||
[2003/30] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.01.2005 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.01.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.02.2005 [2005/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Feintool International Holding AG Industriering 8 3250 Lyss / CH | [2000/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KUNZ, Otto Chüssenberg 403 CH-3267 Seedorf / CH | 02 /
SCHWAB, Martin Mauerweg 9 CH-3283 Kallnach / CH | [2000/44] | Representative(s) | Weiss, Peter Dr. Weiss & Arat Partnerschaftsgesellschaft Zeppelinstrasse 4 78234 Engen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/44] | Weiss, Peter, Dr. Zeppelinstrasse 4 78234 Engen / DE | Application number, filing date | 98961245.2 | 01.12.1998 | [2000/44] | WO1998EP07782 | Priority number, date | DE1997154091 | 07.12.1997 Original published format: DE 19754091 | DE1998115264 | 04.04.1998 Original published format: DE 19815264 | [2000/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9929450 | Date: | 17.06.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1047513 | Date: | 02.11.2000 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.06.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1047513 | Date: | 03.03.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.06.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B21K1/30, B21J5/12 | [2000/44] | CPC: |
B21J5/068 (EP,US);
B21K1/30 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, PT, SE [2003/41] |
Former [2000/44] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM BEARBEITEN EINES WERKSTÜCKES UND ZUGEHÖRIGE VORRICHTUNG | [2003/30] | English: | PROCESS FOR SHAPING A WORK PIECE AND CORRESPONDING DEVICE | [2003/30] | French: | PROCEDE POUR L'USINAGE D'UNE PIECE ET DISPOSITIF CORRESPONDANT | [2003/30] |
Former [2000/44] | VERFAHREN ZUM BEARBEITEN EINES WERKSTÜCKES | ||
Former [2000/44] | PROCESS FOR SHAPING A WORK PIECE | ||
Former [2000/44] | PROCEDE POUR L'USINAGE D'UNE PIECE | Entry into regional phase | 23.08.2000 | National basic fee paid | 23.08.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.08.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.07.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 23.08.2000 | Examination requested [2002/48] | 27.08.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.12.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 10.12.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.12.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.12.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.12.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 11.08.2000 | M01   Fee paid on   23.08.2000 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JPS60102247 ; | [X]GB1096846 (ZD GOMSELMASH) [X] 1,2,7,12,13 * page 3, line 76 - line 108; figure - *; | [A]US3677672 (HARRINGTON JERRY E) [A] 6,14* column 3, line 29 - line 34; figure -; claim 1 *; | [X]US4318292 (BEILKE REUBEN M) [X] 1 * column 2, line 66 - column 3, line 15; figure 5 *; | [XA]EP0077062 (CATERPILLAR TRACTOR CO [US]) [X] 1,2,5,7,12,13 * page 8, line 27 - page 10, line 20; figure 17 * [A] 3,4,8-11; | [A]EP0584907 (O OKA FORGE CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,7,13 * column 4, line 23 - line 57; figure - * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19851009), vol. 009, no. 252, Database accession no. (M - 420), & JP60102247 A 19850606 (SUMITOMO KINZOKU KOGYO KK) [X] 1,7,12,13 * abstract * |