Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1037786

EP1037786 - PASSENGER TRANSPORT SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  23.11.2001
Database last updated on 13.07.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip23.11.2001Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 09.01.2002  [2002/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Earle, Richard Joseph
8 Bayliffes Close Chippenham
Wiltshire SN15 3NY / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/39]For all designated states
Earle, Richard Joseph
8 Bayliffes Close
Chippenham, Wiltshire SN15 3NY / GB
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[2000/39]
Representative(s)Stoner, Gerard Patrick , et al
Mewburn Ellis LLP
City Tower
40 Basinghall Street
London EC2V 5DE / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/39]Stoner, Gerard Patrick , et al
MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway
London WC2B 6HP / GB
Application number, filing date98961310.417.12.1998
[2000/39]
WO1998GB03808
Priority number, dateGB1997002690617.12.1997         Original published format: GB 9726906
[2000/39]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9930949
Date:24.06.1999
Language:EN
[1999/25]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1037786
Date:27.09.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.06.1999
[2000/39]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP24.06.1999
ClassificationInternational:B61B13/10, B61B13/12
[2000/39]
Designated contracting statesBE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   LI,   NL [2000/39]
TitleGerman:PERSONEN - BEFÖRDERUNGSSYSTEME[2000/39]
English:PASSENGER TRANSPORT SYSTEMS[2000/39]
French:SYSTEMES DE TRANSPORT DE PASSAGERS[2000/39]
Entry into regional phase14.07.2000National basic fee paid 
14.07.2000Designation fee(s) paid 
14.07.2000Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.07.1999Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
14.07.2000Examination requested  [2000/39]
06.06.2001Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.11.2001Application withdrawn by applicant  [2002/02]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.12.2000Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[Y]DE3725671  (MEISTER VIKTOR [DE]) [Y] 1 * the whole document *;
 [YA]EP0360710  (SKIRAIL S N C [FR]) [Y] 1 * column 2, line 32 - column 3, line 28; figures 1,2 * [A] 2,3;
 [A]US3854421  (HOFFMANN D, et al) [A] 1-3 * column 3, line 51 - column 5, line 3; figures 1-5 *;
 [A]US3871303  (WOODLING GERALD L) [A] 1-3 * column 3, line 1 - column 7, line 10; figures 1-7 *