Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0971198

EP0971198 - ROBOT FOR EXPLODING LAND MINES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  31.08.2001
Database last updated on 24.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip31.08.2001Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 17.10.2001 [2001/42]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Takasugi, Masanori
8-38-512, Ougi 6-chome, Higashinada-ku Kobe-shi
Hyogo 658-0027 / JP
[N/P]
Former [2000/02]For all designated states
Takasugi, Masanori
8-38-512, Ougi 6-chome, Higashinada-ku
Kobe-shi, Hyogo 658-0027 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[2000/02]
Representative(s)Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis , et al
Beresford Crump LLP
16 High Holborn
London WC1V 6BX / GB
[N/P]
Former [2000/02]Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis , et al
BERESFORD & Co. High Holborn 2-5 Warwick Court
London WC1R 5DJ / GB
Application number, filing date98961407.817.12.1998
[2000/02]
WO1998JP05733
Priority number, dateJP1998003665702.02.1998         Original published format: JP 3665798
[2000/02]
Filing languageJA
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO9939155
Date:05.08.1999
Language:EN
[1999/31]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0971198
Date:12.01.2000
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.08.1999
[2000/02]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:JP05.08.1999
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.12.2000
ClassificationInternational:F41H11/16
[2000/02]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [2000/02]
TitleGerman:ROBOT ZUR DETONATION VON LANDMINEN[2000/02]
English:ROBOT FOR EXPLODING LAND MINES[2000/02]
French:ROBOT SERVANT A FAIRE EXPLOSER DES MINES TERRESTRES[2000/02]
Entry into regional phase21.10.1999Translation filed 
01.10.1999National basic fee paid 
01.10.1999Search fee paid 
01.10.1999Designation fee(s) paid 
01.10.1999Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure01.10.1999Examination requested  [2000/02]
27.02.2001Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2001/42]
15.05.2001Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2001/42]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.200003   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[Y]DE2622162  (MESSERSCHMITT BOELKOW BLOHM) [Y] 1,6,7 * figure - * * page 6, paragraph 2 - page 7, paragraph 3 * * page 8, paragraph 4 - page 11, paragraph 1 *;
 [Y]JPH0674695
 [Y]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19940623), vol. 018, no. 331, Database accession no. (M - 1626), & JP06074695 A 19940318 (MASANORI TAKASUGI) [Y] 1,6,7 * abstract *
International search[A]JPH0674695  ;
 [A]DE3841303